Hartanovich et al v. Finevine, LLC
Plaintiff: Samantha Hartanovich and Donna Gilbert
Defendant: Finevine, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00213
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Donna Gilbert, Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)
October 9, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #14 ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Dismissal, closing case, by Donna Gilbert, Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Court was notified on August 28, 2020 that this matter had settled. Thereafter, the Court directed the parties to file a fully executed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal by September 30, 2020. The deadline has passed and the Court has not received the dismissal papers. The parties are directed to file their dismissal papers or a status report as to the settlement of this matter by October 13, 2020. (Re: #11 Notice of Settlement, 12 Minute Order,,, Setting/Resetting Deadline(s)/Hearing(s),,,,, ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement (Doc. 11). The parties represent in their notice that they have reached a settlement of this matter. Accordingly, all deadlines are hereby stricken. The parties shall file a fully executed Joint Stipulation of Dismissal on or before September 30, 2020., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Dismissal Papers due by 9/30/2020) (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Donna Gilbert, Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Finevine, LLC (Morsman, Andrew)
August 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Finevine, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Samantha Hartanovich, Donna Gilbert (Federman, William)
August 4, 2020 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Finevine, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Unopposed Motion for Additional Time for Defendant to Plead or Answer (Doc. 7) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due September 4, 2020. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 9/4/2020); granting #7 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) for Additional Time to Plead or Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Finevine, LLC (Woodard, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John R Woodard, III on behalf of Finevine, LLC [Note: Attorney John R Woodard, III added to party Finevine, LLC(pty:dft).] (Woodard, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrew Bruce Morsman on behalf of Finevine, LLC [Note: Attorney Andrew Bruce Morsman added to party Finevine, LLC(pty:dft).] (Morsman, Andrew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Finevine, LLC (alg, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William Bernard Federman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Federman, William)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Finevine, LLC (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2207675) by Samantha Hartanovich, Donna Gilbert (Federman, William)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Donna Gilbert, Samantha Hartanovich (Federman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartanovich et al v. Finevine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Hartanovich
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Gilbert
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Finevine, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Bruce Morsman
Represented By: John R Woodard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?