Dixon v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Robert Dixon
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00220
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #9 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Automobile Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Robert Dixon (Smolen, Donald)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Gladd, John)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Andrew Brown on behalf of State Farm Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney Jason Andrew Brown added to party State Farm Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Brown, Jason)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Scott Gladd on behalf of State Farm Automobile Insurance Company [Note: Attorney John Scott Gladd added to party State Farm Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft).] (Gladd, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Robert Dixon (Smolen, Donald)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (alg, Dpty Clk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Automobile Insurance Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2208630) by Robert Dixon (Smolen, Donald)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Robert Dixon (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dixon
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?