Hilliard et al v. Michelin North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lee Hilliard and Charlene Hilliard
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00247
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #9 MOTION to Remand ) by Michelin North America, Inc. ; (Bryan, Connie)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter W. Herzog III (Doc. 10) is granted. Mr. Herzog may appear in this matter on behalf of the Defendant. ; granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter Herzog to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2225352) by Michelin North America, Inc. (With attachments) (Bryan, Connie)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Charlene Hilliard, Lee Hilliard (Barnes, Benjamin)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Benjamin Louis Barnes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Barnes, Benjamin)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Michelin North America, Inc. (Bryan, Connie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Michelin North America, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Michelin North America, Inc. for Michelin North America, Inc.) by Michelin North America, Inc. (Bryan, Connie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Michelin North America, Inc. (Bryan, Connie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Michelin North America, Inc. (Bryan, Connie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Ottawa, case number CJ-2020-72 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2213264) by Michelin North America, Inc. (With attachments) (Bryan, Connie)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Michelin North America, Inc. (Bryan, Connie)
April 24, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Michelin North America, Inc. by Lee Hilliard, Charlene Hilliard (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hilliard et al v. Michelin North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Hilliard
Represented By: Benjamin Louis Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Hilliard
Represented By: Benjamin Louis Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelin North America, Inc.
Represented By: Connie Mae Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?