NOLC, Inc., The et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Bruce Carter and NOLC, Inc., The
Defendant: Jovita Carranza, Steven Mnuchin and United States of America, The
Case Number: 4:2020cv00294
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bruce Carter, NOLC, Inc., The (White, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk pursuant to General Order 20-14, reassigning case to Judge John F Heil, III, Judge Gregory K Frizzell no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-CV-294-JFH-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing NOLC, Inc., The to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward L White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, Edward)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Edward L White on behalf of All Plaintiffs (White, Edward)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint)(paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2223973) by NOLC, Inc., The, Bruce Carter (White, Edward) Modified on 6/23/2020 to add "AMENDED" and to create link to Dkt. #1 (a-hc, Dpty Clk).
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bruce Carter, NOLC, Inc., The (White, Edward)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by NOLC, Inc., The, Bruce Carter (jln, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOLC, Inc., The et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jovita Carranza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Mnuchin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Carter
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: Robert William Haiges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOLC, Inc., The
Represented By: Edward L White
Represented By: Robert William Haiges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?