Buttler v. City of Sperry et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Ray Buttler
Defendant: City of Sperry and John Carr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00355
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by John Carr [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party John Carr(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: John Carr (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by City of Sperry [Note: Attorney Scott Boudinot Wood added to party City of Sperry(pty:dft).] (Wood, Scott)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: City of Sperry (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to John Carr, City of Sperry (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Carr, City of Sperry (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2237375) by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Thomas Ray Buttler (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buttler v. City of Sperry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sperry
Represented By: Scott Boudinot Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carr
Represented By: Scott Boudinot Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ray Buttler
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: John William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?