Moreland et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Jane Nichols and Gary Scott Moreland
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, Brett Alan Mull, Keisha Oberg and City of Chouteau
Case Number: 4:2020cv00366
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County ; (Gooch, Ambre)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Gary Scott Moreland, Rebecca Jane Nichols (McHugh, Brendan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss by Defendant Board (Re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) by Gary Scott Moreland, Rebecca Jane Nichols ; (With attachments) (McHugh, Brendan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Brett Alan Mull (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Brett Alan Mull (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County (With attachments) (Gooch, Ambre)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Keisha Oberg (Gooch, Ambre)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 FILING FEES Paid in Full by City of Chouteau, Brett Alan Mull (alg, Dpty Clk)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Amend Case Caption (Doc. 12) is granted. The parties are directed to remove the minor child's date of birth from all future pleadings. ; granting 12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 JURY DEMAND by Gary Scott Moreland, Rebecca Jane Nichols (McHugh, Brendan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brendan Michael McHugh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McHugh, Brendan)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Defendants Board and Oberg (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, #6 Notice of Removal ) by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, Keisha Oberg (Gooch, Ambre)
July 28, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ambre Camille Gooch on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, Keisha Oberg (Gooch, Ambre)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 Joint STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, City of Chouteau, Brett Alan Mull, Keisha Oberg (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County District Court, case number CV-2019-072 by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, City of Chouteau, Brett Alan Mull, Keisha Oberg (With attachments) (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Stevens Lafferrandre on behalf of Brett Alan Mull [Note: Attorney Robert Stevens Lafferrandre added to party Brett Alan Mull(pty:dft).] (Lafferrandre, Robert)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Calvin Hendrickson on behalf of Brett Alan Mull (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 Joint STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, City of Chouteau, Brett Alan Mull, Keisha Oberg (Hendrickson, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/28/2020 to seal pdf as they were filed unredacted; counsel will file the redacted version using the Errata/Correction event.(dlg, Dpty Clk).
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County District Court, case number CV-2019-072 by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, City of Chouteau, Brett Alan Mull, Keisha Oberg (With attachments) (Hendrickson, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/28/2020 to seal PDFs as they were filed unredacted (dlg, Dpty Clk).
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County, City of Chouteau, Brett Alan Mull, Keisha Oberg (Hendrickson, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2019 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Rebecca Jane Nichols, Gary Scott Moreland (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreland et al v. Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Mayes County
Represented By: Ambre Camille Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett Alan Mull
Represented By: Jeffrey Calvin Hendrickson
Represented By: Robert Stevens Lafferrandre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keisha Oberg
Represented By: Ambre Camille Gooch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chouteau
Represented By: Jason Allen Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Jane Nichols
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Scott Moreland
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?