Wickham v. Wickham et al
Plaintiff: Terry Dean Wickham
Defendant: Jennifer Leann McCormick, Paul Leroy Wickham and Jennifer McCormick
Case Number: 4:2020cv00370
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: exhibits not attached to entry; Correction: attached exhibits (Re: #4 Status Report on Removed Action ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Jennifer McCormick, Paul Leroy Wickham (sc, Dpty Clk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/24/2020: #1 Attachment 1) (sc, Dpty Clk).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Paul Leroy Wickham and Jennifer Leann McCormick (jjs, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/30/2020 to add filer (jjs, Dpty Clk).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Nowata County, case number CV-20-23 by Paul Leroy Wickham and Jennifer Leann McCormick (jjs, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/30/2020 to add filer (jjs, Dpty Clk).
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Jennifer Leann McCormick by Terry Dean Wickham (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wickham v. Wickham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Leann McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Leroy Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Dean Wickham
Represented By: Leonard Marion Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?