Eller v. Horst et al
Plaintiff: Kathryn M Eller
Defendant: Adam Horst, Lanee Kmieczak and Keith Kmieczak
Case Number: 4:2020cv00416
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III (initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 1/25/2021, Discovery due by 2/8/2021, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 6/29/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F Heil III, Jury Trial set for 7/19/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge John F Heil III) (pll, Dpty Clk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Kathryn M Eller (Heckenkemper, Kymberli)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/9/2020) (CDK, Chambers)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 JURY DEMAND by Kathryn M Eller (Heckenkemper, Kymberli)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Adam Horst (Rains, Mark)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Stanley Rains on behalf of Adam Horst [Note: Attorney Mark Stanley Rains added to party Adam Horst(pty:dft).] (Rains, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kymberli Jan-Miyoko Heckenkemper on behalf of Kathryn M Eller (Heckenkemper, Kymberli)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lisa Rene Riggs on behalf of Kathryn M Eller (Riggs, Lisa)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Keith Kmieczak, Lanee Kmieczak (Rains, Mark)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Stanley Rains on behalf of Lanee Kmieczak (Rains, Mark)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Stanley Rains on behalf of Keith Kmieczak (Rains, Mark)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Craig County, case number CJ-2020-44 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2250884) by Keith Kmieczak, Lanee Kmieczak (With attachments) (Rains, Mark)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Keith Kmieczak, Lanee Kmieczak (Rains, Mark)
July 2, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Kathryn M Eller (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eller v. Horst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Horst
Represented By: Mark Stanley Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lanee Kmieczak
Represented By: Mark Stanley Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Kmieczak
Represented By: Mark Stanley Rains
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn M Eller
Represented By: Lisa Rene Riggs
Represented By: Kymberli Jan-Miyoko Heckenkemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?