Saylor et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Plaintiff: Nathan Saylor and Lisa Jo Saylor
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00434
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motion for Recognition as Local Counsel, or in the Alternative for Relief from Local Civil Rule 83.3 filed by attorneys Craig L. Cook and Keith M. Kannett (Doc. 57) is granted. Counsel may appear in this matter without association of local counsel. ; granting #57 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
September 21, 2020 Filing 63 MAIL to James H Keale Returned - remailed on 9/21/20 to Tannenbaum Keale Three Gateway Center suite 1301 100 Mulberry Street Newark NJ 07102 - new address obtained from law firm website. (Re: #47 Letter re: Local Counsel Requirement ) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 17, 2020 Filing 62 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michelle M. Tessier on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation [Note: Attorney Michelle M. Tessier added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).] (Tessier, Michelle)
September 17, 2020 Filing 61 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christine Kain on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation [Note: Attorney Christine Kain added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).] (Kain, Christine)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell The Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michelle M. Tessier (Doc. 58) and Christine R. M. Kain (Doc. 59) are granted. Counsel may appear in this matter on behalf of the Defendant. ; granting #58 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
September 14, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christine R.M. Kain to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2266377) by Boston Scientific Corporation (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 14, 2020 Filing 58 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michelle M. Tessier to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2266369) by Boston Scientific Corporation (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
September 14, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Motion for Relief); Correction: changed event (Motion for Miscellaneous Relief) (Re: #57 MOTION for Recognition as Local Counsel or Relief from LR 83.3 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
September 11, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Recognition as Local Counsel or Relief from LR 83.3 and incorporated brief by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor (Kannett, Keith) Modified on 9/14/2020 to change event (sac, Dpty Clk).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell ; terminating attorney Jon Andrew Strongman; Michael A. Tanenbaum; Eric M. Anielak and James H. Keale ; granting #55 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s) (SAS, Chambers)
September 4, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) Defendant Boston Scientific Corporation Motion for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel Following Transfer by Boston Scientific Corporation (Buchan, James)
September 2, 2020 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Boston Scientific Corporation (Buchan, James)
September 1, 2020 Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, recusing Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne. Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy reassigned to case., changing case number to 20-cv-434-JED-FHM (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sdc, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 52 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
August 31, 2020 Filing 51 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
August 27, 2020 Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 20-cv-434-JED-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 49 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Michael A. Tanenbaum (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 48 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Jon A. Strongman (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 47 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to James H. Keale (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 46 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Eric M. Anielak (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 45 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Nathaniel McGraw Jones (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 44 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Keith Michael Kannett (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 43 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Craig L. Cook (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Boston Scientific Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 41 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from West Virginia Southern
August 25, 2020 Filing 40 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02326 - Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF 161 - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Exhibit ECF 184 - Stipulation for the Production of Docs and Electronically Stored Info, #3 Exhibit ECF 196 - New Direct Filing Order, Master Complaint, SF Complaint, #4 Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint, #6 Exhibit ECF 7153 - Docket Control Order - BSC Wave 5 Cases, #7 Exhibit ECF 8077 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Badylak, #8 Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak, #9 Exhibit ECF 8142 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Badylak, #10 Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #11 Exhibit ECF 5033 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Badylak, #12 Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak, #13 Exhibit ECF 8063 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Caraballo, #14 Exhibit ECF 4831 - Motion and Memo in Support of Pltf_s MTE re Caraballo, #15 Exhibit ECF 8145 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Caraballo, #16 Exhibit ECF 4973 - BSC_s Memo in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #17 Exhibit ECF 5029 - Pltf_s Reply to BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Caraballo, #18 Exhibit ECF 6042 - Memo Opinion and Order re Caraballo, #19 Exhibit ECF 8088 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Little, #20 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 1, #21 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 2, #22 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3, #23 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 4, #24 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 5, #25 Exhibit ECF 4825 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Little, #26 Exhibit ECF 8141 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Little, #27 Exhibit ECF 4979 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Little, #28 Exhibit ECF 5034 - Pltf_s Reply to Deft_s Response to Pltf_s MTE Little, #29 Exhibit ECF 6044 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Little, #30 Exhibit ECF 8076 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Spiegelberg, #31 Exhibit ECF 7004 - Pltf_s MTE and Memo re Spiegelberg, #32 Exhibit ECF 4827 - Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg and Memo in Support, #33 Exhibit ECF 8149 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response re Spiegelberg, #34 Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #35 Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #36 Exhibit ECF 7160 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #37 Exhibit ECF 5031 - Pltf_s Reply in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #38 Exhibit ECF 6049 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Spiegelberg, #39 Exhibit ECF 8085 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Blaivas, #40 Exhibit ECF 4822 - BSC_s Motion and Memo in Support MTE Blaivas, #41 Exhibit ECF 8106 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Blaivas, #42 Exhibit ECF 4962 - Pltf_s Opp to BSC_s MTE Blaivas, #43 Exhibit ECF 6029 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Blaivas, #44 Exhibit ECF 8087 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert MTE Margolis, #45 Exhibit ECF 4804 - BSC_s MTE Margolis and Memo in Support, #46 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh A, #47 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh B, #48 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh C, #49 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh D, #50 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh E, #51 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh F, #52 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh G, #53 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh H, #54 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh I, #55 Exhibit ECF 4804 - Exh J, #56 Exhibit ECF 8110 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Margolis, #57 Exhibit ECF 4960 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Margolis, #58 Exhibit ECF 6035 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Margolis, #59 Exhibit ECF 8066 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion re Mays, #60 Exhibit ECF 4805 - BSC_s Memo of Law in Support of Testimony of Mays, #61 Exhibit ECF 8119 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Mays, #62 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 1, #63 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 2, #64 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 3, #65 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 4, #66 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 5, #67 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 6, #68 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 7, #69 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 8, #70 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 9, #71 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Exh 10, #72 Exhibit ECF 4972 - Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #73 Exhibit ECF 8165 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to MTE Mays, #74 Exhibit ECF 5037 - BSC_s Reply to Pltf_s Memo in Opp to Dft_s MTE Mays, #75 Exhibit ECF 6036 - Memo Opinion and Order Mays, #76 Exhibit ECF 8071 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Pence, #77 Exhibit ECF 4815 - BSC_s MTE Pence and Memo in Support, #78 Exhibit ECF 8111 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Pence, #79 Exhibit ECF 4968 - Pltf_s Response in Opp to BSC_s MTE Pence, #80 Exhibit ECF 8166 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #81 Exhibit ECF 5038 - BSC_s Reply Memo in Support of MTE Pence, #82 Exhibit ECF 6038 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Pence, #83 Exhibit ECF 216 - Pltf_s Memo in Support of MTE Spiegelberg, #84 Exhibit ECF 275 - BSC_s Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg, #85 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh A, #86 Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B, #87 Exhibit ECF 473 - Amended Memo Opinion and Order (Daubert Motions))(Anielak, Eric) (Modified on 8/26/2020 to add party filers) (mkw). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 8/27/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 8/26/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/13/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
May 27, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor in opposition to #37 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Partial Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - depo excerpt - Dr. Nicole Chainakul, #2 Exhibit B - case specific report of Dr. M. Tom Margolis, #3 Exhibit C - depo excerpt - Dr. M. Tom Margolis)(Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION by Boston Scientific Corporation for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 36 AMENDED NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEO DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael T. Margolis on April 28, 2019 at 10:00 am (PDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nathaniel McGraw Jones on behalf of Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor. (Jones, Nathaniel) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE TO TAKE VIDEO DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Michael T. Margolis on August 28, 2019 at 10:00 am (PDT) (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Friends and Family on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Naysa Bemies on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Hannah Saylor on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nicole Saylor on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 17, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Boston Scientific Corporation of Leonda McClure on TBD at TBD (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Sunshine Murray on 4/23/19 at 2:00 pm (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nichole Chainakul on April 12, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nichole Chainakul on April 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Issuance of a Subpeona to Dr. Nicole Chainakul by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nicole Chainakul on March 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
February 27, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Issuance of a Subpoena to Dr. Nicole Chainakul by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nathan Saylor on February 12, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Lisa Saylor on February 12, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
January 21, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor for Response to First Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
December 21, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Boston Scientific Corporation for Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Lisa Jo Saylor on February 13, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Dr. Sunshine Murray on January 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nichole Chainakul on January 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM by Boston Scientific Corporation of Nichole Chainakul on January 29, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
November 17, 2018 Filing 13 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor for Plaintiff Fact Sheet. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
November 17, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor for Plaintiff Fact Sheet. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
November 15, 2018 Filing 11 PLAINTIFF FACT SHEET filed by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by James H. Keale on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Keale, James) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRETRIAL ORDER # 196 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 5 Cases) The cases on Exhibits A are: 1.) removed from the pending inactive docket; and 2.) placed on the active docket. As to the cases on Exhibits A and B: 1.) The cases are no longer eligible for return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from scheduling deadlines; 2.) To the extent other defendants, in addition to Boston Scientific Corporation, are named in the cases on Exhibits A and B, the deadlines below also apply to them; 3.) The Clerk will file this Docket Control Order in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in the main MDL, every case listed on Exhibits A and B becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order; and 4.) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 5 cases with one important exception. If any of the cases on any exhibit were previously on a docket control order and dispositive and Daubert deadlines had passed before such cases became inactive, the parties may not file or refile dispositive or Daubert motions without first seeking leave of court for good cause shown. A. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all BSC Wave 5 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due 11/15/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due 11/22/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due 12/21/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs due 02/22/2019; Expert disclosure served by defendants due 03/22/2019; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal due 03/29/2019; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due 04/29/2019; Filing of dispositive motions due 05/13/2019; Response to dispositive motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to dispositive motions due 06/03/2019; Filing of Daubert motions due 05/13/2019; Responses to Daubert motions due 05/27/2019; Reply to response to Daubert motions due 06/03/2019. B. MOTION PRACTICE. 3.) Confidential Documents. Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 03/25/2019, and any response is due by 04/09/2019. Any reply is due by 04/15/2019. The court expects full compliance with Local Civil Rule 26.4(c). C. CASES READY FOR TRANSFER, REMAND OR TRIAL 1.) Venue Recommendations. By no later than 04/06/2019, the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 04/13/2019. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/31/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 5 cases identified on Exhibits A and B) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 5/04/2018. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/2/2018. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
May 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
May 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Keith Michael Kannett on behalf of Lisa Jo Saylor, Nathan Saylor. (Kannett, Keith) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 3 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 179 (Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund - Boston Scientific Corp. & The Law Offices of A. Craig Eiland, PC.) entered on 04/17/2018 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (mmw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-6422219. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mlh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/27/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saylor et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Saylor
Represented By: Craig L Cook
Represented By: Nathaniel McGraw Jones
Represented By: Keith Michael Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Jo Saylor
Represented By: Craig L Cook
Represented By: Nathaniel McGraw Jones
Represented By: Keith Michael Kannett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Eric M. Anielak
Represented By: Michael A. Tanenbaum
Represented By: Jon Andrew Strongman
Represented By: James H. Keale
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Christine Kain
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Represented By: Michelle M. Tessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?