Young v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bobby E Young
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00438
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Andrew Gallant on behalf of Social Security Administration [Note: Attorney Jeffrey Andrew Gallant added to party Social Security Administration(pty:dft).] (Gallant, Jeffrey)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE of Complaint by Publication re: Social Security Administration (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Bobby E Young (Osterhout, Karl)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT Consenting to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Bobby E Young (Osterhout, Karl)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #3 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (jjs, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2020 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) (jjs, Dpty Clk) - ENTERED IN ERROR - Modified on 8/31/2020 (jjs, Dpty Clk).
August 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION Leave to Proeed Without Local Counsel by Bobby E Young (Osterhout, Karl)
August 29, 2020 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2257052) by Bobby E Young (Osterhout, Karl)
August 29, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Bobby E Young (Osterhout, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby E Young
Represented By: Karl E Osterhout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?