Berger v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Deborah S Berger
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00440
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting Filing Fee deadline(s): ( Filing Fee due by 11/5/2020); denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; accepting #7 Report and Recommendation (kjp, Dpty Clk)
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy (Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy , setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Filing Fee due by 9/16/2020) (Re: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk randomly reassigning this case upon the filing of Dkt #4 and pursuant to General Order 16-08. Reassigning case to Judge Gregory K. Frizzell and Magistrate Judge Frank H. McCarthy, changing case number to 20-cv-440-GKF-FHM (Re: #4 Statement Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Social Security) ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT Declining Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Deborah S Berger (White, Timothy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Deborah S Berger (White, Timothy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Deborah S Berger (With attachments) (White, Timothy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Deborah S Berger (White, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah S Berger
Represented By: Timothy Morris White
Represented By: Richmond Jay Brownson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?