Watts v. Freeman Health System
Plaintiff: Brenda Watts
Defendant: Freeman Health System
Case Number: 4:2020cv00452
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : With the agreement of counsel, following the filing of the amended complaint and second motion to transfer case ; finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 8 Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District by Freeman Health System (With attachments) (Clark, Nathan)
October 21, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District (submitted as part of #7 ), #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Brenda Watts ; (Hamilton, Laura)
October 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Freeman Health System (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brenda Watts (With attachments) (Hamilton, Laura)
October 20, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freeman Health System (Clark, Nathan)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Freeman Health System to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 14, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: this is a two-part motion of which one part was efiled; Correction: efiled Motion to Transfer Case to Other District - see 8 (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case to Other District (submitted as part of #7 ) by Freeman Health System (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Freeman Health System (With attachments) (Clark, Nathan) Modified on 10/14/2020; this is a two-part motion of which one part was efiled - see 8 for Motion to Transfer Case to Other District (sac, Dpty Clk).
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nathan Edward Clark on behalf of Freeman Health System [Note: Attorney Nathan Edward Clark added to party Freeman Health System(pty:dft).] (Clark, Nathan)
October 13, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lindsey Elizabeth Albers on behalf of Freeman Health System [Note: Attorney Lindsey Elizabeth Albers added to party Freeman Health System(pty:dft).] (Albers, Lindsey)
September 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Freeman Health System (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brenda Watts (Smolen, Donald)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Freeman Health System (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Freeman Health System (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2262715) by Brenda Watts (Smolen, Donald)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brenda Watts (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Freeman Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Watts
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Hunter Keith Bailey
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Health System
Represented By: Lindsey Elizabeth Albers
Represented By: Nathan Edward Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?