Robinson v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Patrice L Robinson
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv00477
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 ***Remark: Case transferred from Oklahoma Northern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:20-cv-06255, filed 10/29/2020. (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2020 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #7 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the MDL Panel, transferring case (terminates case) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 ***Remark: Received Minute Order from MDL re: transferee clerk to transmit a certified copy of the Panel Order to transfer to the district court from which the action is being transferred. (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 ***Remark: Received Conditional Transfer Order from MDL re: stay is lifted (sc, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (dlg, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Andrea Rae Rust on behalf of Patrice L Robinson (Rust, Andrea)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2273456) by Patrice L Robinson (Rust, Andrea) Modified on 9/24/2020 to add filing fee receipt information.(dlg, Dpty Clk).
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Patrice L Robinson (Rust, Andrea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrice L Robinson
Represented By: Andrea Rae Rust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?