Washington v. Wal-Mart Store, Inc.
Plaintiff: Edward Washington
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00494
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
2 Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/16/2020) (SAS, Chambers)
November 7, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-494-JED-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk)
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.) by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra)
October 1, 2020 Filing 10 JURY DEMAND by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Pratt, Alexandra)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Wal-Mart Store, Inc. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #8 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt on behalf of Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (Pratt, Alexandra)
October 1, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Wal-Mart Store, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jjs, Dpty Clk)
October 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Mark Thomas Steele on behalf of Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (Steele, Mark)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (Steele, Mark)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from creek, case number cj-2020-186 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2277393) by Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (With attachments) (Steele, Mark)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Wal-Mart Store, Inc. (Steele, Mark)
July 30, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Wal-Mart Store, Inc. by Edward Washington (jjs, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Wal-Mart Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Washington
Represented By: Charles L. Richardson
Represented By: Colton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Represented By: Alexandra Elizabeth Pratt
Represented By: Mark Thomas Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?