Anderson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sherry Lynn Anderson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00527
Filed: October 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Christine D Little
Referring Judge: Frank H McCarthy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning this case pursuant to General Order 20-37, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Christine D Little, Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 20-cv-527-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk)
October 19, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Frank H McCarthy ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (tjc, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2020 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gayle Louise Troutman on behalf of Sherry Lynn Anderson (Troutman, Gayle)
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Supporting Affidavit by Sherry Lynn Anderson (Troutman, Gayle)
October 15, 2020 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Sherry Lynn Anderson (Troutman, Gayle)
October 15, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sherry Lynn Anderson (Troutman, Gayle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry Lynn Anderson
Represented By: Gayle Louise Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?