Allen v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Carolyn Allen
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 4:2020cv00570
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Social Security Administration Served Office of General Counsel on 11/20/20 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Carolyn Allen (With attachments) (Parmele, Dan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Social Security Administration Served Attorney General 11/23/20 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Carolyn Allen (With attachments) (Parmele, Dan)
December 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Social Security Administration Served US Attorney 11/19/2020 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Carolyn Allen (With attachments) (Parmele, Dan)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Christine D Little Plaintiff's Application for Leave to File Action Without Payment of Fees (Doc. 3) and Motion to Waive Requirement for Association of Local Counsel (Doc. 5) are both hereby granted. ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; granting #5 Motion to Waive (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lml, Chambers)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT Consenting to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction by Carolyn Allen (Parmele, Dan)
November 5, 2020 ***Remark: 3 summons in hold tray (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Court Clerk of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge [includes the following attachments: (1) a Statement as to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form, and (2) a copy of General Order 16-08] (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Waive Requirement of Association of Local Counsel by Carolyn Allen (Parmele, Dan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dan Parmele on behalf of Carolyn Allen (Parmele, Dan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Carolyn Allen (Parmele, Dan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Carolyn Allen (Parmele, Dan)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Carolyn Allen (Parmele, Dan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Allen
Represented By: Dan Parmele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?