Ace American Insurance Company et al v. Otis Elevator Company
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company and Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv00572
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell setting a scheduling conference for January 7, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. If any party requests a court reporter be present for the conference, please notify Courtroom Deputy Karen Perkins by January 5, 2021, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2020 Filing 22 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (Halbeisen, Stephen)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice [Docs. 18, 19, and 20] ; adding attorney Thomas W Baker,Chelsea M Croy Smith,Stephanie A Rzepka for Otis Elevator Company ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 16, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephanie A. Rzepka to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2321043) by Otis Elevator Company (With attachments) (Vincent, Evan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Chelsea M. Croy Smith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2321033) by Otis Elevator Company (With attachments) (Vincent, Evan)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Thomas W. Baker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2321012) by Otis Elevator Company (With attachments) (Vincent, Evan)
December 11, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Otis Elevator Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 12/31/2020) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Otis Worldwide Corporation for Otis Elevator Company) by Otis Elevator Company (Vincent, Evan)
December 9, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Otis Elevator Company (Vincent, Evan)
December 9, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Evan Grant Ellis Vincent on behalf of Otis Elevator Company [Note: Attorney Evan Grant Ellis Vincent added to party Otis Elevator Company(pty:dft).] (Vincent, Evan)
November 19, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Appearance - Attorney) (Re: #12 Notice (Other), ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 19, 2020 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Notice); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Appearance - Attorney) (Re: #11 Notice (Other), ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance by Marcos Hazan-Cohen on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (Hazan-Cohen, Marcos) Modified on 11/19/2020 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance by Stephen Halbeisen on behalf of Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (Halbeisen, Stephen) Modified on 11/19/2020 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk).
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motions for Pro Hac Vice of Out-of-State Counsel [Docs. 5 & 6] and ; adding attorney Marcos Hazan-Cohen,Stephen M Halbeisen for Ace American Insurance Company,Marcos Hazan-Cohen,Stephen M Halbeisen for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company,Marcos Hazan-Cohen,Stephen M Halbeisen for Zurich American Insurance Company ; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
November 16, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Company, Ltd., Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd. for Zurich American Insurance Company) by Zurich American Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc for Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company) by Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)
November 16, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent INA Holdings Corporation, Corporate Parent INA Financial Corporation, Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings, Inc. for Ace American Insurance Company) by Ace American Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)
November 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Stephan M. Halbeisen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2302408) by Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (With attachments) (Goolsby, Robert)
November 16, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Marcos Hazan-Cohen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2302391) by Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (With attachments) (Goolsby, Robert)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Otis Elevator Company (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 5, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Otis Elevator Company (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2297154) by Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ace American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Zurich American Insurance Company (Goolsby, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ace American Insurance Company et al v. Otis Elevator Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Todd Goolsby
Represented By: Stephen M Halbeisen
Represented By: Marcos Hazan-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Todd Goolsby
Represented By: Stephen M Halbeisen
Represented By: Marcos Hazan-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Todd Goolsby
Represented By: Stephen M Halbeisen
Represented By: Marcos Hazan-Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Elevator Company
Represented By: Chelsea M Croy Smith
Represented By: Thomas W Baker
Represented By: Stephanie A Rzepka
Represented By: Evan Grant Ellis Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?