Bond v. McCarthy
Plaintiff: Crystal Bond
Defendant: Ryan D McCarthy
Case Number: 4:2020cv00594
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by G Gene Thompson on behalf of Crystal Bond [Note: Attorney G Gene Thompson added to party Crystal Bond(pty:pla).] (Thompson, G)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Crystal Bond (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) by Crystal Bond (With attachments) (Gamino, Daniel)
December 2, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Howard Berkson on behalf of Crystal Bond (Berkson, Howard)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Crystal Bond (Gamino, Daniel)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crystal Bond (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Crystal Bond (Gamino, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Ryan D McCarthy (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Howard Berkson on behalf of Crystal Bond (Berkson, Howard) Modified on 11/24/2020 - ENTERED IN ERROR - blank PDF attached - counsel notified to refile document (sac, Dpty Clk).
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel Joseph Gamino on behalf of Crystal Bond (Gamino, Daniel)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ryan D McCarthy (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2307155) by Crystal Bond [Note: Attorney Daniel Joseph Gamino added to party Crystal Bond(pty:pla).] (Gamino, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bond v. McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan D McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Bond
Represented By: Howard Berkson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Gamino
Represented By: G Gene Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?