Meadors v. Gist et al
Plaintiff: Keenan H Meadors
Defendant: Tulsa Public Schools Board of Education, Chief Rubles, Tulsa Public Schools, Mathias Wicks, Deborah Gist, Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County, Oklahoma and Jorge Robles
Case Number: 4:2020cv00595
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Tulsa Public Schools be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #16 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Chief Rubles be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #15 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Chief Mathias Wicks be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #14 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (jln, Dpty Clk)
December 29, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Tulsa Public Schools (Wade, Eric)
December 29, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Chief Rubles (Wade, Eric)
December 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Mathias Wicks (Wade, Eric)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/29/2021) (RGG, Chambers)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing counsel for defendants to file forthwith separate notices of party name corrections as needed per their notices in the pleadings at [10, 11]. (Re: #11 Answer, #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opening Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 28, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Tulsa Public Schools (Wade, Eric)
December 28, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Opening Brief in Support by Deborah Gist, Chief Rubles, Tulsa Public Schools, Tulsa Public Schools Board of Education, Mathias Wicks (Wade, Eric)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #8 is granted. Defendants' Answer(s) or other responsive pleading(s) due no later than 12/28/2020 as requested. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 12/28/2020); granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #1 Complaint, #6 Supplement ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
December 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Deborah Gist, Chief Rubles, Tulsa Public Schools, Tulsa Public Schools Board of Education, Mathias Wicks (Wade, Eric)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric D Wade on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Eric D Wade added to party Deborah Gist(pty:dft), Attorney Eric D Wade added to party Chief Rubles(pty:dft), Attorney Eric D Wade added to party Tulsa Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Eric D Wade added to party Tulsa Public Schools Board of Education(pty:dft), Attorney Eric D Wade added to party Mathias Wicks(pty:dft).] (Wade, Eric)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Keenan H Meadors (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Chief Rubles (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Keenan H Meadors (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Tulsa Public Schools Board of Education (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Keenan H Meadors (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Keenan H Meadors (sc, Dpty Clk)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Keenan H Meadors (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadors v. Gist et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keenan H Meadors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Public Schools Board of Education
Represented By: Eric D Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Rubles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa Public Schools
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathias Wicks
Represented By: Eric D Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Gist
Represented By: Eric D Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent School District No. 1 of Tulsa County, Oklahoma
Represented By: Eric D Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Robles
Represented By: Eric D Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?