Martin v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Chaquetta D Martin
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 4:2020cv00618
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John E Dowdell
Referring Judge: John F Heil
2 Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 10) is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading is due January 29, 2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/29/2021); granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
January 18, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Second) (Re: #2 Complaint ) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Kane, Matthew)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John E Dowdell Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is granted. Defendant's answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed by January 19, 2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/19/2021); granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (SAS, Chambers)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Unum Group (DE) for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Kane, Matthew)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer , Move Against or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint ) by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (Kane, Matthew)
December 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Matthew Colin Kane on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America [Note: Attorney Matthew Colin Kane added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).] (Kane, Matthew)
December 21, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phillip Gardner Whaley on behalf of UNUM Life Insurance Company of America [Note: Attorney Phillip Gardner Whaley added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft).] (Whaley, Phillip)
December 1, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge John F Heil, III. Chief Judge John E Dowdell reassigned to case., changing case number to 20-CV-618-JED-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against UNUM Life Insurance Company of America (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2309962) by Chaquetta D Martin (Shook, Jonathan)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Chaquetta D Martin (Shook, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Matthew Colin Kane
Represented By: Phillip Gardner Whaley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaquetta D Martin
Represented By: Jonathan Everett Shook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?