Fredrickson v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Tim Fredrickson
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons, Attorney General of the United States and Raymond Byrd
Case Number: 4:2020cv00646
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 LETTER to to Petitioner (copy of #7 and docket sheet sent) (srt, Dpty Clk)
January 25, 2021 ***Remark: Received one summons, one USM-285 and various other documents (forwarded to OKWD) (srt, Dpty Clk)
January 19, 2021 ***Remark: forwarded summons & USM 285s by mail to USDC WD/OK (Re: Remark ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 15, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (Documents Terminated: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis , #3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel ) (see document number #7 ) (sac, Dpty Clk)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma for all further proceedings., transferring case (terminates case) (Re: #6 Amended Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
January 7, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Tim Fredrickson (srt, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Tim Fredrickson (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Tim Fredrickson (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tim Fredrickson (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 28, 2020 ***Remark: 3 summons and 3 USM 285s in hold tray by Tim Fredrickson (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 21, 2020 ***Remark: mailed plaintiff one blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis (form AO-240M) identified for Case No. 20-CV-0646-CVE-CDL; one blank civil rights form (form PR-01), marked amended and identified for Case No. 20-CV-0646-CVE-CDL, along with instructions for completing the form; and three blank summonses and three blank USM-285 Marshal service forms, with all forms identified for Case No. 20-CV-0646-CVE-CDL to: Tim Fredrickson 3200 S KINGS HWY CUSHING, OK 74023 (sac, Dpty Clk) Modified on 12/21/2020; due to an oversight, mailings did not occur until 12/21/2020, rather than 12/16/2020 (sac, Dpty Clk).
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis, amended complaint, and completed summonses from plaintiff due 1/15/2021; directing Court Clerk to send forms to plaintiff., setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Filing Fee due by 1/15/2021, Miscellaneous Deadline set for 1/15/2021) (Re: #1 Complaint ) (RGG, Chambers)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Tim Fredrickson (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fredrickson v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?