McCall v. Covidien LP et al
Plaintiff: Dani McCall
Defendant: Joshua Mourot, Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A., Coviden, L.P., Northwest Medical Center, Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC doing business as Northwest Medical Center - Springdale previously named as Northwest Medical Center and Covidien LP
Case Number: 4:2021cv00005
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Covidien LP (With attachments) (Schovanec, Ashley)
March 3, 2021 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Joshua Mourot (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald)
March 2, 2021 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Party Joshua Mourot, MD Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(3) by Joshua Mourot (With attachments) (Wilson, Adam)
March 2, 2021 Filing 34 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Adam Leigh Wilson on behalf of Joshua Mourot [Note: Attorney Adam Leigh Wilson added to party Joshua Mourot(pty:dft).] (Wilson, Adam)
March 2, 2021 Filing 33 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James W Connor, Jr on behalf of Joshua Mourot [Note: Attorney James W Connor, Jr added to party Joshua Mourot(pty:dft).] (Connor, James)
February 26, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Bases ) by Dani McCall ; [Note: Attorney John William Warren added to party Dani McCall(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Warren, John)
February 18, 2021 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Covidien Holding Inc., Corporate Parent Medtronic PLC for Covidien LP) by Covidien LP (Schovanec, Ashley)
February 16, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
February 12, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Ogletree, L)
February 12, 2021 Filing 28 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Ogletree, L)
February 12, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by L Earl Ogletree on behalf of Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. [Note: Attorney L Earl Ogletree added to party Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A.(pty:dft).] (Ogletree, L)
February 12, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hayden Ryan King on behalf of Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. [Note: Attorney Hayden Ryan King added to party Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A.(pty:dft).] (King, Hayden)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Covidien LP and Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting Northwest Arkansas's motion to waive local counsel requirement ; granting #13 Motion to Waive (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting Coviden until 3/4/2021 to answer ; granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
February 9, 2021 Filing 22 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy Durrell White on behalf of Covidien LP [Note: Attorney Amy Durrell White added to party Covidien LP(pty:dft).] (White, Amy)
February 9, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Coviden, L.P. be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #19 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
February 9, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Gilmer Wolfe on behalf of Coviden, L.P. [Note: Attorney Thomas Gilmer Wolfe added to party Coviden, L.P.(pty:dft).] (Wolfe, Thomas)
February 9, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Coviden, L.P. (Schovanec, Ashley)
February 9, 2021 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Coviden, L.P. (Schovanec, Ashley)
February 9, 2021 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley Marie Schovanec on behalf of Coviden, L.P. [Note: Attorney Ashley Marie Schovanec added to party Coviden, L.P.(pty:dft).] (Schovanec, Ashley)
February 9, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Northwest Medical Center be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #14 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Northwest Medical Center (Horton, Johnathan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Waive Local Rule 83.3 by Northwest Medical Center (Horton, Johnathan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support of Motion (Re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Bases ) by Northwest Medical Center ; (Horton, Johnathan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Other Bases by Northwest Medical Center (With attachments) (Horton, Johnathan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Community Health Systems, Inc., Corporate Parent Tenyson Holdings, LLC for Northwest Medical Center) by Northwest Medical Center (Horton, Johnathan)
February 5, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnathan Dwaine Horton on behalf of Northwest Medical Center [Note: Attorney Johnathan Dwaine Horton added to party Northwest Medical Center(pty:dft).] (Horton, Johnathan)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Northwest Medical Center (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Coviden, L.P. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (srt, Dpty Clk) Modified on 1/8/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR - duplicate entry of #4 (srt, Dpty Clk).
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (ll, Dpty Clk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, reassigning case to Judge John F Heil, III, Judge Claire V Eagan no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-5-JFH-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (crp, Dpty Clk)
January 7, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Coviden, L.P., Joshua Mourot, Northwest Medical Center, Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2332436) by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dani McCall (Smolen, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Covidien LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Mourot
Represented By: James W Connor, Jr
Represented By: Adam Leigh Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roller Weight Loss and Advanced Surgery, P.A.
Represented By: Hayden Ryan King
Represented By: L Earl Ogletree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coviden, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Arkansas Hospitals, LLC doing business as Northwest Medical Center - Springdale previously named as Northwest Medical Center
Represented By: Johnathan Dwaine Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien LP
Represented By: Amy Durrell White
Represented By: Ashley Marie Schovanec
Represented By: Thomas Gilmer Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dani McCall
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: John William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?