International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 v. Brent Electric Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584
Defendant: Brent Electric Co., Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00103
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
2 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support of Motion by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Pittman, Glenda)
April 22, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk reassigning the magistrate judge in this case pursuant to General Order 21-15, reassigning case to Magistrate Judge Susan E Huntsman, Magistrate Judge Jodi F Jayne no longer assigned to case, changing case number to 21-cv-103-TCK-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Brent Electric Co., Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Mark E. Hunt and R. Eddie Wayland are admitted Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Brent Electric Company, Inc. ; adding attorney R. Eddie Wayland for Brent Electric Co., Inc.,R. Eddie Wayland for Brent Electric Co., Inc. ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
April 6, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) R. Eddie Wayland to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2387402) by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Doyle, Kevin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Mark E. Hunt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2387397) by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Doyle, Kevin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 17 COUNTERCLAIM against International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (With attachments) (Doyle, Kevin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 16 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Doyle, Kevin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Doyle, Kevin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Doyle, Kevin)
April 6, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Alexander Robert Telarik on behalf of Brent Electric Co., Inc. [Note: Attorney Alexander Robert Telarik added to party Brent Electric Co., Inc.(pty:dft).] (Telarik, Alexander)
April 6, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Mitchener, III on behalf of Brent Electric Co., Inc. [Note: Attorney Robert Mitchener, III added to party Brent Electric Co., Inc.(pty:dft).] (Mitchener, Robert)
April 6, 2021 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kevin Pierce Doyle on behalf of Brent Electric Co., Inc. [Note: Attorney Kevin Pierce Doyle added to party Brent Electric Co., Inc.(pty:dft).] (Doyle, Kevin)
March 29, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Brent Electric Co., Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank)
March 10, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Pittman, Glenda)
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Glenda Pittman on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 [Note: Attorney Glenda Pittman added to party International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584(pty:pla).] (Pittman, Glenda)
March 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Glenda L. Pittman is granted leave to proceed Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. ; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
March 9, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Glenda L. Pittman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2369748) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (With attachments) (Frasier, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Frank W Frasier, III on behalf of International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Brent Electric Co., Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2369160) by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 (Frasier, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584 v. Brent Electric Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Electric Co., Inc.
Represented By: R. Eddie Wayland
Represented By: Kevin Pierce Doyle
Represented By: Robert Mitchener, III
Represented By: Alexander Robert Telarik
Represented By: Mark E Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local Union 584
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Represented By: Glenda Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?