Tyre v. Crow
Petitioner: Jacob Darrell Tyre
Respondent: Scott Crow
Case Number: 4:2021cv00150
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 COPIES OF STATE COURT HABEAS TRANSCRIPT(S)/RECORD(S) by Scott Crow (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 COPIES OF STATE COURT HABEAS TRANSCRIPT(S)/RECORD(S) by Scott Crow (With attachments) (Johnson, Sheri)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 (paid $5 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2385703) ) by Scott Crow ; (With attachments) (Johnson, Sheri)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 5/14/2021, Replies due by 6/14/2021); granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 (paid $5 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2385703) ) (lah, Chambers)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 (paid $5 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2385703) ) by Scott Crow (Johnson, Sheri)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sheri Marie Johnson on behalf of Scott Crow [Note: Attorney Sheri Marie Johnson added to party Scott Crow(pty:res).] (Johnson, Sheri)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***Remark: Emailed docket numbers 1 and 3 to the Office of the Attorney General at fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov (Re: #3 Order,, Directing Respondent to Show Cause re: PWHC, #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 (paid $5 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2385703) ) (srt, Dpty Clk)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing Respondent to show cause why the writ should not issue and file a response to the petition( Responses due by 5/7/2021, Replies due by 6/7/2021) (Re: #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 (paid $5 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2385703) ) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jacob Darrell Tyre (Casey, Andrew)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254 (paid $5 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2385703) by Jacob Darrell Tyre (Casey, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyre v. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jacob Darrell Tyre
Represented By: Andrew Michael-Don Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Crow
Represented By: Sheri Marie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?