Itasca Images, LLC v. PennWell Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Attorney Gerald L Jackson and Itasca Images, LLC
Defendant: PennWell Corporation, Clarion Events Ltd. and Clarion Events, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00164
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Party Clarion Events Ltd. by Clarion Events Ltd. (With attachments) (Nelson, Todd)
May 20, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: #3 Complaint ) by Clarion Events, Inc., PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lmc, Chambers)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Scott Michael Flaherty is admitted Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff. ; ; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
May 5, 2021 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing PennWell Corporation, Clarion Events, Inc., and Clarion Events Ltd. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Paul Limekiller on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney David Paul Limekiller added to party Clarion Events Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Limekiller added to party Clarion Events, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David Paul Limekiller added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Limekiller, David)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #3 Complaint ) by Clarion Events Ltd., Clarion Events, Inc., PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Clarion Events USA Limited, Other Affiliate Clarion Events Holdings Inc. for Clarion Events Ltd., Clarion Events, Inc., PennWell Corporation) by Clarion Events Ltd., Clarion Events, Inc., PennWell Corporation (Nelson, Todd)
May 4, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Todd Alan Nelson on behalf of Clarion Events Ltd., Clarion Events, Inc., PennWell Corporation [Note: Attorney Todd Alan Nelson added to party Clarion Events Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Nelson added to party Clarion Events, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Alan Nelson added to party PennWell Corporation(pty:dft).] (Nelson, Todd)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott M. Flaherty to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2393544) by Itasca Images, LLC (With attachments) (Jackson, Gerald)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Clarion Events Ltd., Clarion Events, Inc., PennWell Corporation (ll, Dpty Clk)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT on Copyrights/Patents/Trademarks by Itasca Images, LLC (srt, Dpty Clk)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Itasca Images, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (srt, Dpty Clk)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Itasca Images, LLC for Itasca Images, LLC) by Itasca Images, LLC (Jackson, Gerald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2390169) by Itasca Images, LLC (Jackson, Gerald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Gerald Lee Jackson on behalf of Itasca Images, LLC (Jackson, Gerald)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Itasca Images, LLC (Jackson, Gerald) Modified on 4/12/2021 to correct filer (srt, Dpty Clk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Itasca Images, LLC v. PennWell Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PennWell Corporation
Represented By: Todd Alan Nelson
Represented By: David Paul Limekiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarion Events Ltd.
Represented By: Todd Alan Nelson
Represented By: David Paul Limekiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarion Events, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Alan Nelson
Represented By: David Paul Limekiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney Gerald L Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Itasca Images, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?