Knighten v. Tulsa County Sheriff Department et al
Plaintiff: DeWayne Herndon Knighten, Herndon DeWayne Barnes and Herndon DeWayne Jones
Defendant: B Byrd, Tulsa County Sheriff Department, Aaron Ramsey and Turn Key Health Services Provider
Case Number: 4:2021cv00186
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address by DeWayne Herndon Knighten (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 8 MAIL to DeWayne Herndon Knighten Returned - remailed on 05/21/2021 to LARC PO BOX 260 Lexington, OK 73051 - new address obtained from Dkt#7 . (Re: 3 Minute Order,, Recusing Judge,, Changing Case Number, ) (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by DeWayne Herndon Knighten (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2021 ***Remark: mailed four blank summonses and four blank United States Marshals Service forms (form USM-285), all identified for Case No. 21-CV-0186- CVE-JFJ, along with instructions for completing the forms to Plaintiff DeWayne Herndon Knighten #547058 OK State Reformatory PO BOX 514 GRANITE, OK 73547-0514 (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Order to Agency Having Custody of Plaintiff for Payment of Filing Fee, Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of DeWayne Herndon Knighten (Re: #5 Order,,,, Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment,,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,,, ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Knighten's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. # 2) is granted. The requirement to submit an initial partial filing fee is waived. Knighten shall make monthly payments from his inmate account(s), as described in this order, until he has paid the $350 filing fee in full. The Clerk of Court shall mail to Knighten four blank summonses and four blank United States Marshals Service forms (form USM-285), all identified for Case No. 21-CV-0186-CVE-JFJ, along with instructions for completing these forms. Knighten shall promptly complete and return one summons and one USM-285 form for each defendant. ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of DeWayne Herndon Knighten; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (RGG, Chambers)
May 18, 2021 ***Remark: copy of order #6 mailed to Plaintiff DeWayne Herndon Knighten #547058 and and to officials at the Oklahoma State Reformatory, PO BOX 514, GRANITE, OK 73547-0514 and email to the Oklahoma Department of Corrections Trust Fund Office at Trustfund@doc.ok.gov. (Re: #6 Order,, Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment,,, ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by DeWayne Herndon Knighten (ll, Dpty Clk)
April 27, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Claire V Eagan reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-CV-186-CVE-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by DeWayne Herndon Knighten (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by DeWayne Herndon Knighten (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knighten v. Tulsa County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeWayne Herndon Knighten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herndon DeWayne Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herndon DeWayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulsa County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Services Provider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?