Dobson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Delores Dobson
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2021cv00199
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #23 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 23, 2021 Filing 25 STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Bass, Jonathan)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : Granting defendants' motion ; terminating attorney Richard B North, Jr ; granting #23 Motion to Withdraw Attorney(s); granting #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
June 9, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Attorney(s) and, MOTION to Substitute Attorney Following Remand by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Bass, Jonathan)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/24/2021) (pll, Dpty Clk)
May 21, 2021 Filing 21 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bass on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Jonathan Bass added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Bass added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Bass, Jonathan)
May 21, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Joseph Griffith on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Joseph Griffith added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Griffith added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Griffith, Joseph)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Judge John F Heil, III : granting defendants' motion for admission pro hac vice as to Joseph Griffith and Jonathan Bass. Local counsel is directed to advise them of the requirements of Local General Rule 4-4(a) and the need to register as a CM/ECF user in this Court ; granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
May 19, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for C R Bard Incorporated) by C R Bard Incorporated (Buchan, James)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc., Corporate Parent Becton Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated (Buchan, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jonathan Bass to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2412801) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph P. Griffith to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2412798) by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (With attachments) (Buchan, James)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Micah John Petersen on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Micah John Petersen added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Petersen, Micah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Craig Buchan on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated [Note: Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney James Craig Buchan added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft).] (Buchan, James)
May 12, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Richard B North, Jr. (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Debra J Humphrey (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 21-cv-199-JFH-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
May 7, 2021 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Arizona 17-cv-4311-DGC
May 7, 2021 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Oklahoma via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/26/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 *AMENDED by Doc. #7 --FINAL SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/20/21. (MAP) Modified on 4/29/2021 (SJF). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/15/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 50 - (1) The dismissal orders in the cases listed on Attachment A are vacated (see Doc. 22012-2). The Clerk is directed to reinstate each case in this MDL. See Order for Full Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 4/14/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 *VACATED By Doc. #4 *ORDER granting Stipulation (doc. 21021 in Lead MDL-15-2641) of Dismissal Without Prejudice. The claims of the Plaintiffs are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice to the re-filing of same, and the parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/20. (MAP) *Modified on 4/15/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-04311-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]
November 27, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-14898077 filed by Delores Dobson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LSP) [Transferred from Arizona on 5/7/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobson v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Dobson
Represented By: Debra J Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Jonathan Bass
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B North, Jr
Represented By: James Craig Buchan
Represented By: Jonathan Bass
Represented By: Joseph Griffith
Represented By: Micah John Petersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?