Cunningham et al v. Norris et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Cunningham and Brenda Cunningham
Defendant: JMN Transportation, Inc. and Jeffrey Blaine Norris
Case Number: 4:2021cv00247
Filed: June 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying #8 Motion to Remand (RGG, Chambers)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/1/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham (Frasier, James)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham ; (Hickman, Steven)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris ; (Phillips, Harris)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham [Note: Attorney Steven R Hickman added to party Brenda Cunningham(pty:pla), Attorney Steven R Hickman added to party Johnny Cunningham(pty:pla).] (Hickman, Steven)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/14/2021) (RGG, Chambers)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing JMN Transportation, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JMN Transportation, Inc. (Phillips, Harris)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Harris A Phillips, III on behalf of JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris (Phillips, Harris)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris (Phillips, Harris)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number CJ-2020-207 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2426096) by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris (With attachments) (Phillips, Harris)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris [Note: Attorney Harris A Phillips, III added to party JMN Transportation, Inc. (pty:dft).] (Phillips, Harris)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham (sc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham et al v. Norris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Cunningham
Represented By: George Michael Miles
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Cunningham
Represented By: James Edward Frasier
Represented By: George Michael Miles
Represented By: Frank W Frasier, III
Represented By: Steven R Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMN Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Harris A Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Blaine Norris
Represented By: Harris A Phillips, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?