Abdullahi v. Ceva Grounds US, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Abdirizak Abdullahi
Defendant: Abdinor Salad Olow, Armis Advisers and Ceva Grounds US, L.P.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00263
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 ***Remark: Case filed in OKED on 06/30/2021 as case # 21-cv-192 (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #2 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the Court Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Eastern District of Oklahoma., transferring case (terminates case) (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal ) (RGG, Chambers)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ceva Grounds US, L.P. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from District Court Sequoyah County, case number CJ-21-50 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2434840) by Ceva Grounds US, L.P. (With attachments) (McKee, William)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ceva Grounds US, L.P. (McKee, William)
April 6, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Abdirizak Abdullahi (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdullahi v. Ceva Grounds US, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdinor Salad Olow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armis Advisers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ceva Grounds US, L.P.
Represented By: William Todd McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdirizak Abdullahi
Represented By: Michael E Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?