Vue v. Dowling et al
Plaintiff: Ong Vue
Defendant: Janet Dowling and Aaron Peruskie
Case Number: 4:2021cv00265
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell directing plaintiff to submit an initial partial payment or show cause, setting/resetting Filing Fee deadline(s): ( Initial Filing Fee due by 9/2/2021) (lah, Chambers)
July 20, 2021 ***Remark: Received two summons and two USM-285s (in hold tray) (Re: #1 Complaint ) (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 14, 2021 ***Remark: per order #3 two blank summonses and two blank service forms (form USM-285), along with the instructions for completing these forms mailed to plaintiff Ong Vue #264881 Dick Conner Correctional Center 129 CONNER ROAD HOMINY, OK 74035 (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Ong Vue (lah, Chambers)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell directing plaintiff to submit an initial partial payment ; setting/resetting Filing Fee deadline(s): ( Initial Filing Fee due by 7/29/2021); granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (lah, Chambers)
July 8, 2021 ***Remark: Copy of Order Dkt#4 mailed to Dick Conner Correctional Center, Attn: Prisoner Accounts, 129 Conner Road Hominy, OK 74035; Emailed copy of Order to Trustfund@doc.ok.gov (Re: #4 Order, Directing Monthly Prisoner Payment ) (ll, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Ong Vue (ll, Dpty Clk)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Janet Dowling, Aaron Peruskie by Ong Vue (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vue v. Dowling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Peruskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ong Vue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?