Stephens v. Transunion et al
Plaintiff: Danielle Stephens
Defendant: Transunion, Equifax and Experian
Case Number: 4:2021cv00285
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Service (Re: #5 Amended Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (ll, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Re: #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Default Judgement by Danielle Stephens (sc, Dpty Clk)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Transunion, Equifax, Experian to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax) by Equifax (Skinner, Maris)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Maris Amanda Rae Skinner on behalf of Equifax [Note: Attorney Maris Amanda Rae Skinner added to party Equifax(pty:dft).] (Skinner, Maris)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Transunion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Transunion) by Transunion (Goodnight, Jason)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Goodnight on behalf of Transunion (Goodnight, Jason)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Equifax, Experian, Transunion [Note: Attorney Jason Goodnight added to party Transunion(pty:dft).] (Goodnight, Jason)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment against Transunion, Equifax and Experian by Danielle Stephens (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Equifax (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Transunion (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Experian (Re: #1 Complaint ) by Danielle Stephens (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Danielle Stephens (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Due to the inclusion of personal identifiers and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2(e)(2), the Court hereby, for good cause, restricts remote electronic access to Document #1 to registered case participants. If a future filing in this case contains personal identifiers, the Court may impose the same restrictions on said filing pursuant to this order. (Re: #1 Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Danielle Stephens (ll, Dpty Clk) Modified on 7/14/2021 to restrict PDF, per Minute Order # 2 (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Transunion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion
Represented By: Jason Goodnight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax
Represented By: Maris Amanda Rae Skinner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?