Blair v. MC Residential Communities, LLC
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Blair
Defendant: MC Companies and MC Residential Communities, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00297
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 1/7/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2022, Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/25/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 5/16/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 27, 2021 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Leslie Briggs on behalf of Roosevelt Blair (Briggs, Leslie)
August 27, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Roosevelt Blair [Note: Attorney Leslie Briggs added to party Roosevelt Blair(pty:pla).] (Briggs, Leslie)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/27/2021) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Court has a significant number of criminal cases awaiting trial due to the COVID-19 pandemic and the decision of the Supreme Court in McGirt v. United States, 140 S. Ct. 2452 (2020). Criminal cases must be tried before civil cases, and civil cases will most likely not be tried by a district judge unless and until all criminal cases on a monthly trial docket have been resolved or continued. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, the parties in a civil case may consent to a trial before a magistrate judge, and this option is available for civil litigants who wish to have a jury trial. The AO-85 consent forms are available on the U.S. District Court website. However, the parties are free to withhold consent to a trial before a magistrate judge without any adverse consequences, and the parties are reminded of this option only as a possible means of expediting a civil trial in cases in which the parties desire to expedite the final resolution of their case. The parties may also request an additional settlement conference at any time. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for MC Companies be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #7 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MC Companies (Broussard, Steven)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by MC Companies (Broussard, Steven)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by MC Companies (Broussard, Steven)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing MC Companies to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Johnathan Louis Rogers on behalf of MC Companies [Note: Attorney Johnathan Louis Rogers added to party MC Companies(pty:dft).] (Rogers, Johnathan)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Steven Anthony Broussard on behalf of MC Companies (Broussard, Steven)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by MC Companies (Broussard, Steven)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa, case number CJ-2021-01706 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2446610) by MC Companies (With attachments) (Broussard, Steven)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by MC Companies (Broussard, Steven)
June 14, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against MC Companies by Roosevelt Blair (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blair v. MC Residential Communities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roosevelt Blair
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Leslie Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC Companies
Represented By: Johnathan Louis Rogers
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MC Residential Communities, LLC
Represented By: Johnathan Louis Rogers
Represented By: Steven Anthony Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?