Moore v. Connexions Loyalty Acquisitions LLC
Plaintiff: Lakeiia Moore
Defendant: Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00318
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: John F Heil
2 Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2617
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Aaron Holt on behalf of Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (Holt, Aaron)
October 1, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (Mitchener, Robert)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice and ; adding attorney Aaron Holt for Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC ; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney(s) Aaron Holt to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2483942) by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (With attachments) (Mitchener, Robert)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 10/1/2021) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (Vaughan, Randall)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Howard Berkson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Berkson, Howard)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (lah, Chambers)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (Mitchener, Robert)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Chief Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-CV-318-GKF-JFJ (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co., Corporate Parent cxLoyalty Global Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase Holdings, LLC for Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC) by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC [Note: Attorney Randall Gene Vaughan added to party Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC(pty:dft).] (Vaughan, Randall)
August 5, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Mitchener, III on behalf of Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (Mitchener, Robert)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randall Gene Vaughan on behalf of Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (Vaughan, Randall)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-18889 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2455511) by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC (With attachments) (Vaughan, Randall)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC [Note: Attorney Randall Gene Vaughan added to party Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC(pty:dft).] (Vaughan, Randall)
June 29, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC by Lakeiia Moore (blc, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Connexions Loyalty Acquisitions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeiia Moore
Represented By: Howard Berkson
Represented By: Jakob Ryan Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connexions Loyalty Acquisition LLC
Represented By: Randall Gene Vaughan
Represented By: Robert Mitchener, III
Represented By: Aaron Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?