Sweet et al v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Sweet and Margaret Sweet
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Allstar Marketing Group, LLC doing business as Allstar Products Group, LLC, Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd. doing business as Chateau Ste. Michelle, Ste. Michelle International Ltd., Walgreens Co. and Ste. Michelle International LLC
Cross Defendant: Allstar Marketing Group, LLC and Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00358
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. for Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.) by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (Johnson, Stephani)
October 29, 2021 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreens Co.) by Walgreens Co. (Robertson, Jason)
October 28, 2021 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Ste. Michelle Wine Estates LLC, Corporate Parent International Wine & Spirits LLC, Corporate Parent SMWE Washington Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Washington Holdings LLC for Ste. Michelle International LLC) by Ste. Michelle International LLC (Tucker, Colin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for Ste. Michelle International LTD be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk)
October 27, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Party Name Correction by Ste. Michelle International Ltd. (Tucker, Colin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent International Wine & Spirits LLC, Corporate Parent SMWE Washington Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Washington Holdings LLC for Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd.) by Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd. (Tucker, Colin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Ste. Michelle Wine Estates LLC, Corporate Parent International Wine & Spirits LLC, Corporate Parent SMWE Washington Intermediate LLC, Corporate Parent Washington Holdings LLC for Ste. Michelle International Ltd.) by Ste. Michelle International Ltd. (Tucker, Colin) Modified on 10/27/2021; - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong PDF attached - counsel directed to refile document (sc, Dpty Clk).
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; adding attorney Carla De Leon Stafford for Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.,Carla De Leon Stafford for Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. ; granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Re: #21 Errata/Correction to Document ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
October 25, 2021 Filing 21 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carla De Leon Stafford to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2500404) ) by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (Johnson, Stephani)
October 25, 2021 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephani R. Johnson on behalf of Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (With attachments) (Johnson, Stephani) Modified on 10/25/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR (sc, Dpty Clk).
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephani R. Johnson on behalf of Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (With attachments) (Johnson, Stephani) Modified on 10/25/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR (sc, Dpty Clk).
October 22, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) Carla De Leon Stafford to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number BOKNDC-2500404) by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (With attachments) (Johnson, Stephani)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Walgreens Co. and Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
October 21, 2021 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Stephani R. Johnson on behalf of Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (Johnson, Stephani)
October 21, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. [Note: Attorney Stephani R. Johnson added to party Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.(pty:dft).] (Johnson, Stephani)
October 21, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd. and Ste. Michelle International Ltd. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
October 20, 2021 Filing 13 CROSS-CLAIM with Jury Demand against Allstar Marketing Group, LLC, Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Ste. Michelle International Ltd., Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd. by Walgreens Co. (Robertson, Jason)
October 20, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Walgreens Co. [Note: Attorney Jason Allen Robertson added to party Walgreens Co.(pty:dft).] (Robertson, Jason)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Ste. Michelle International Ltd., Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd. [Note: Attorney Colin Hampton Tucker added to party Ste. Michelle International Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Colin Hampton Tucker added to party Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd.(pty:dft).] (Tucker, Colin)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Ste. Michelle International Ltd. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jack Sweet (Richardson, Colton)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Allstar Marketing Group, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jack Sweet (Richardson, Colton)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jack Sweet (Richardson, Colton)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Walgreens Co. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jack Sweet (Richardson, Colton)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to All Defendants (ll, Dpty Clk)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Colton Richardson on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Colton Richardson added to party Jack Sweet(pty:pla), Attorney Colton Richardson added to party Margaret Sweet(pty:pla).] (Richardson, Colton)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jason Charles Messenger on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Jason Charles Messenger added to party Jack Sweet(pty:pla), Attorney Jason Charles Messenger added to party Margaret Sweet(pty:pla).] (Messenger, Jason)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Charles L. Richardson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Richardson, Charles)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2469672) by Jack Sweet (Richardson, Charles)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jack Sweet (Richardson, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweet et al v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Sweet
Represented By: Charles L. Richardson
Represented By: Jason Charles Messenger
Represented By: Colton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Sweet
Represented By: Charles L. Richardson
Represented By: Jason Charles Messenger
Represented By: Colton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Represented By: Carla De Leon Stafford
Represented By: Stephani R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstar Marketing Group, LLC doing business as Allstar Products Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd. doing business as Chateau Ste. Michelle
Represented By: Colin Hampton Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ste. Michelle International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Co.
Represented By: Jason Allen Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ste. Michelle International LLC
Represented By: Colin Hampton Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Allstar Marketing Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Ste. Michelle Wine Estates Ltd.
Represented By: Colin Hampton Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?