Cade et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Plaintiff: LaDonna S Cade and John Cade
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp. doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics, Howmedica Osteonics Corp. and Stryker Corporation
Case Number: 4:2021cv00359
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation ; (Ward, Jeremy)
October 5, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) by John Cade, LaDonna S Cade ; (Lundy, Jerry)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Plaintiffs until 10/5/2021 to file their response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; a reply, if any, shall be due by 10/19/2021. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 10/5/2021, Replies due by 10/19/2021); granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion (Re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss ) by John Cade, LaDonna S Cade (Lundy, Jerry)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerry Dean Lundy on behalf of John Cade, LaDonna S Cade (Lundy, Jerry)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case until resolution of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 5]. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
September 7, 2021 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Stryker Corporation for Howmedica Osteonics Corp.) by Howmedica Osteonics Corp. (Ward, Jeremy)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Other Affiliate Howmedica Osteonics Corp. for Stryker Corporation) by Stryker Corporation (Ward, Jeremy)
September 7, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation (Ward, Jeremy)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeremy Kalon Ward on behalf of Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation [Note: Attorney Jeremy Kalon Ward added to party Howmedica Osteonics Corp.(pty:dft).] (Ward, Jeremy)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Howmedica Osteonics Corp. and Stryker Corporation to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from District Court of Tulsa County, case number CJ-2020-3184 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2469481) by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation (With attachments) (Ward, Jeremy)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Howmedica Osteonics Corp., Stryker Corporation (Ward, Jeremy)
October 19, 2020 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by LaDonna S Cade, John Cade (bjb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cade et al v. Howmedica Osteonics Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaDonna S Cade
Represented By: Jerry Dean Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Cade
Represented By: Jerry Dean Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp. doing business as Stryker Orthopaedics
Represented By: Jeremy Kalon Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
Represented By: Jeremy Kalon Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Kalon Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?