Johnson v. Transforce, Inc.
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Defendant: Transforce, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00448
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/25/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 5/9/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/6/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (clb, Dpty Clk)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT by James Johnson [Note: Attorney Leslie Briggs added to party James Johnson(pty:pla).] (Briggs, Leslie)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/22/2021) (lmc, Chambers)
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Transforce, Inc. (Kemp, Brandon)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Logistics Services Corporation, Corporate Parent TransForce Group, LLC for Transforce, Inc.) by Transforce, Inc. (Kemp, Brandon)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Transforce, Inc. (Kemp, Brandon)
October 18, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Transforce, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brandon Davis Kemp on behalf of Transforce, Inc. (Kemp, Brandon)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-2653 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2495730) by Transforce, Inc. (With attachments) (Kemp, Brandon)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Transforce, Inc. (Kemp, Brandon)
September 10, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Transforce, Inc. by James Johnson (bjb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Transforce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Johnson
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Leslie Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transforce, Inc.
Represented By: Brandon Davis Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?