Washington v. Ables et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Washington
Defendant: Jett Autrey Ables, Jett A Ables, Jett Ables, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2021cv00451
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE Issuing Subpoenas to Produce Documents by Jett Autrey Ables (With attachments) (Prentice, Timothy)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III : Modifying the scheduling order to show the trial start time to be 8:45 am, setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): (time change only) ( Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 08:45 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (Re: #12 Scheduling Order,, Setting/Resetting Scheduling Order Date(s), ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Dispositive Motions due by 4/25/2022, Discovery due by 5/9/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2022 at 09:30 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III, Jury Trial set for 10/17/2022 at 08:45 AM before Chief Judge John F Heil III) (JFH1, Chambers)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Nicholas Washington (Truskett, John)
November 5, 2021 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John Paul Truskett on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Truskett, John)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Timothy J Prentice on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables [Note: Attorney Timothy J Prentice added to party Jett Autrey Ables(pty:dft).] (Prentice, Timothy)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 11/22/2021) (JFH1, Chambers)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III re: failure to prosecute (JFH1, Chambers)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brad Roberson on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables [Note: Attorney Brad Roberson added to party Jett Autrey Ables(pty:dft).] (Roberson, Brad)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lauren Nicole Watson on behalf of Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2021-2680 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2496057) by Jett Autrey Ables (With attachments) (Watson, Lauren)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jett Autrey Ables (Watson, Lauren)
September 14, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Jett Autrey Ables, Jane Doe, John Doe by Nicholas Washington (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. Ables et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jett Autrey Ables
Represented By: Brad Roberson
Represented By: Lauren Nicole Watson
Represented By: Timothy J Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jett A Ables
Represented By: Brad Roberson
Represented By: Lauren Nicole Watson
Represented By: Timothy J Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jett Ables
Represented By: Brad Roberson
Represented By: Lauren Nicole Watson
Represented By: Timothy J Prentice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Washington
Represented By: John Paul Truskett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?