Hill v. SoClean, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eric Hill
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00460
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that the motion #9 is granted. Defendant's time to answer or file other responsive pleading is extended to 21 days after JPML issues decision on pending MDL motion. ; striking/terminating deadline(s)/Hearing(s); granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, #9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
November 23, 2021 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent LifeBrands Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent SoClean Parent LP for SoClean, Inc.) by SoClean, Inc. (Love, R)
November 23, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing SoClean, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by SoClean, Inc. [Note: Attorney R Richard Love, III added to party SoClean, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Love, R)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Wayne Downs on behalf of Eric Hill (Downs, Darrell)
October 27, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Logan Joseph Hathcoat on behalf of Eric Hill [Note: Attorney Logan Joseph Hathcoat added to party Eric Hill(pty:pla).] (Hathcoat, Logan)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R Stratton Taylor on behalf of Eric Hill (Taylor, R)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrell Wayne Downs on behalf of Eric Hill [Note: Attorney Darrell Wayne Downs added to party Eric Hill(pty:pla).] (Downs, Darrell)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Logan Joseph Hathcoat on behalf of Eric Hill (Hathcoat, Logan) Modified on 10/25/2021 - ENTERED IN ERROR - wrong PDF attached - counsel directed to refile document (sc, Dpty Clk).
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R Stratton Taylor on behalf of Eric Hill (Taylor, R)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against SoClean, Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2499732) by Eric Hill (Taylor, R)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Eric Hill (Taylor, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. SoClean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hill
Represented By: R Stratton Taylor
Represented By: Darrell Wayne Downs
Represented By: Logan Joseph Hathcoat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoClean, Inc.
Represented By: R Richard Love, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?