Beverage v. Rausch Sturm, LLP et al
Plaintiff: Jake Beverage
Defendant: Rausch Sturm, LLP and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00481
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rausch Sturm, LLP (Ferrell, Robert)
December 22, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Ferrell, Robert)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Rausch Sturm, LLP and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
December 13, 2021 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Ferrell on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm, LLP [Note: Attorney Robert Ferrell added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ferrell added to party Rausch Sturm, LLP(pty:dft).] (Ferrell, Robert)
December 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline is granted in part. Defendants shall file their Answer to plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 22, 2021 ; granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (GKFJ, Judge)
December 10, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) by Jake Beverage ; (Wandres, Victor)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Answer Deadline [Doc. 7] is expedited to December 16, 2021, setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Responses due by 12/16/2021) (Re: #7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
December 10, 2021 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Cheek, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rausch Sturm, LLP (Cheek, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm, LLP (Cheek, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by David Alan Cheek on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm, LLP [Note: Attorney David Alan Cheek added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Alan Cheek added to party Rausch Sturm, LLP(pty:dft).] (Cheek, David)
December 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Rausch Sturm, LLP (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jake Beverage (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jake Beverage (With attachments) (Wandres, Victor)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm, LLP (ll, Dpty Clk)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Rausch Sturm, LLP (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2510358) by Jake Beverage (Wandres, Victor)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jake Beverage (Wandres, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beverage v. Rausch Sturm, LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Beverage
Represented By: Victor R Wandres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rausch Sturm, LLP
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Robert Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: David Alan Cheek
Represented By: Robert Ferrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?