Wilkerson v. Faith Technologies, Inc.
Plaintiff: William David Wilkerson
Defendant: Faith Technologies, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00495
Filed: November 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 12 JOINT STATUS REPORT by William David Wilkerson (Haupt, Shannon)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/28/2022) (lmc, Chambers)
December 23, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Faith Technologies, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (blc, Dpty Clk)
December 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Faith Technologies, Inc. (Whatley, Nathan)
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Faith Technologies, Inc. (Whatley, Nathan)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nathan Lee Whatley on behalf of Faith Technologies, Inc. [Note: Attorney Nathan Lee Whatley added to party Faith Technologies, Inc.(pty:dft).] (Whatley, Nathan)
December 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Faith Technologies, Inc. (Re: #2 Complaint ) by William David Wilkerson (Leonard, Jana)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Faith Technologies, Inc. (lmt, Dpty Clk)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shannon C Haupt on behalf of William David Wilkerson [Note: Attorney Shannon C Haupt added to party William David Wilkerson(pty:pla).] (Haupt, Shannon)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jana Beth Leonard on behalf of William David Wilkerson (Leonard, Jana)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Faith Technologies, Inc. (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2516117) by William David Wilkerson (Leonard, Jana)
November 18, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by William David Wilkerson (Leonard, Jana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilkerson v. Faith Technologies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William David Wilkerson
Represented By: Jana Beth Leonard
Represented By: Shannon C Haupt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan Lee Whatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?