Gabriel v. Melton Truck Lines
Plaintiff: Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel
Defendant: Melton Truck Lines
Case Number: 4:2021cv00519
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #9 ) (sc, Dpty Clk)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; dismissing/terminating case (terminates case) ; granting #8 Motion to Dismiss (Documents Terminated: #8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice ) (lmc, Chambers)
January 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel (sc, Dpty Clk)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; directing court clerk to take action; granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s); granting #6 Motion to Clarify (Re: 4 Minute Order, Ruling on Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ) (lmc, Chambers)
December 6, 2021 ***Remark: $25.00 money order returned to Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel 1307 THURSTON AVE SEBRING, FL 33870 (Re: #7 Order,, Directing Court Clerk to Take Action,,,, Ruling on Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s),, Ruling on Motion to Clarify, ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Clarify by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel (lmt, Dpty Clk)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Melton Truck Lines by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. Melton Truck Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawud Canaan Sturrup Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melton Truck Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?