Mohn v. United States
Plaintiff: Ayinde Mohn
Defendant: United States
Case Number: 4:2021cv00530
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) by Ayinde Mohn ; (ll, Dpty Clk)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in issuing a scheduling order in this case until resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [Doc. 4]. (Re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell Counsel for Defendant is directed to provide a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court containing a paper copy of the document as filed at Doc. 2, with each exhibit under its respective numbered tab. Said paper copy shall be a complete and exact duplicate of the document after filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers)
December 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States (Gallant, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United States (Gallant, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Craig County District Court, case number PG-21-20 by United States (Gallant, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by United States (Gallant, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against United States by Ayinde Mohn (bjb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohn v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayinde Mohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Jeffrey Andrew Gallant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?