Robinson v. Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stacey Robinson
Defendant: Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00557
Filed: December 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 8/1/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 9/6/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/24/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 11/21/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. (Richardson, Denelda)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 1/31/2022) (RGG, Chambers)
December 30, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. (Richardson, Denelda)
December 23, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (bjb, Dpty Clk)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. for Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc.) by Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. (Richardson, Denelda)
December 23, 2021 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Denelda Richardson on behalf of Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. (Richardson, Denelda)
December 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Rogers County District Court, case number CJ-2021-346 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2533704) by Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. (With attachments) (Richardson, Denelda)
December 23, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. (Richardson, Denelda)
November 30, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc. by Stacey Robinson (bjb, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Robinson
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Lake Mental Health Center, Inc.
Represented By: Denelda Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?