Lamb et al v. City of Tulsa, Oklahoma et al
Plaintiff: Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson, Jeremy Agee, Deon Anderson, Joshua Atterberry, Phillip Austin, Mark Avila, Donnie Back, Drew Bailey, Trent Baker, Christopher Alan Baldwin, Istvan Balogh, James Barnes, Travis Barnes, Jordan Barnett, Bryan Beall, Raymond Lee Beard, Keith Beck, Ryan Beeler, Trey Blankenship, Jordan Blount, Bryan Bohbrink, Alexa Booth, Andrew Boyd, Nolan Boyd, Jayme Brooks, Kyle Brooks, Redell Brown, David Brown, Jr., Stephen Bryan, John Buck, Gary Bullock, Tiji Burch, Justin Buthod, Justin Caldwell, Paul Campanell, Joseph Carollo, Stephen Cassity, Michael Chandler, Robert Chorette, Nathan Christie, Brett Cockrum, James Connors, Kellen Davis, Matthew Dickerson, Derek Dixon, Jason Dobson, Marty Dukes, Annalee Dunaway, Katrina Duncan, Travis Eason, Kyle Eller, Justin Ellington, Justin Embrey, Joshua Evans, Christopher Field, Brian Fields, Chad Foster, Erick Franzen, Matthew Frederickson, Curtis Freeman, James Fuller, Lyle Fulton, Douglas Funston, Dylan Garcia, Ryan Garrett, Joshua Gibson, Thomas Gillespie, Tony Gillespie, Aaron Goins, Bryan Goins, Kent Gooch Jr., Angelisa Goodrich, Leland Gray, Stephen Green, Tanner Gregory, John Griffin, Victor Grimes, Zachary Hamby, Lyle Hammock, Scott Harper, Teddy Harwood, Matthew Heath, Angel Hernandez, Colt Herren, Bennie Herring, Darren Hickson, Shawn Holland, Blake Hollingsworth, Kevin Horner, Travis Howard, Thomas Hufford, Michael Hughes, Timothy Ingram, Steven Isaacs, Adam Joseph, Jeremy Jurena, Stephen Kendrick, James Knight, James Kremers, Jacob Lamb, Nicholas Lancaster, Jeremy Land, Nolan Lane, Jay LaValley, Ty Lewis, Joe Littlefield, James Long, Julie Lynn, Charles Mangold, Kevin Mann, Chad Martin, Darrell Martin, James Martin, Tyler Martin, Vance Massey, Jr, Tracy McAlister, Richard McCreary, Xavier McNac, Devin McNown, Nicholas McQuay, David Merrill, Jacob Meyer, Blake Mitchell, Justin Montgomery, Danie Morgan, John Morgan, Trenton Morris, Jade Morrison, Jim Moseby, Dan Newbury, Jim Nimmo, Houston Nole, Jimmy Ober, Robert Page II, Roy Parsons, Lyle Payne, Jonathan Pierce, Danny Pitts, Michael Pitts, Brien Pritchard, Kody Rackers, Brandon Record, Robert Redricks, Jon Reeves, William Remmert, Cade Reyerson, David Rice, Jake Richison, Alec Ridener, Nicholas Ridener, Ryan Rider, James Roach, Courtney Robinson, David Rollandini, Joshua Rollins, Mike Rudick, Chad Savill, Johnnie Sawyer Jr., Roger Schafer, Micah Seibel, Stephen Shaw, Travis Sheeder, Michael Siler, Brett Sinkbeil, James Skinner, Andrew Smith, Bradley Smith, Brandon Smith, Ryan Spyres, Travis Stallings, James Stanfield, Austin Stevens, Jacob Stewart, Robert Stewart, Gary Stika, Scotty Stokes, Michael Stout, Thomas Sunny, Gerry Tarver, Gerry De'Juan Tarver, Matthew Tavaglione, Jenifer Teeter, David Thomas, Shelby Thompson, Timothy Thompson, Ken Thornburg, Heath Tye, Chase Tyler, Cory Vanarsdel, Colby Vanbuskirk, Colt Vandolah, Ryan Walker, Kofi Wallace, Colin Ward, Justin Weber, Matthew Weeks, Christopher Weisberg, Justin Whinery, Jacob Wilson, James Wilson, Mark Wright, James Yoder, Dillon Youngblood, Joshua Zweifel, Dyce Applegate, Jose Ariza, Jordan Ashlock, Evan Baker, Dustin Bartling, David Beals, Jared Belk, Matthew Bell, Chad Bentley, Dicus Benton, Daniel Best, Gary Billups, Anthonie Bounds, Barret Bowman, Brody Bowman, Trent Brennen, Stacey Briggs, Jayme Buck, Blake Burd, Garnett Burkhalter III, Traer Burnett, Jerry Camp, Todd Canady, Arthur Candler, Aaron Cash, Anthony Castorena, Nicholas Cates, Elvert Celestine, Shawn Clark, Walter Clark IV, Dalton Clifton, Craig Coats, Conrad Collison, Justin Cook, Ryan Creek, Jared Crowder, Jeremiah Daniels, Tanner DiMarco, Kevin Dickerson, Michael Dumond, Dallas Duncan, Raymond Duran, Grant Ellingson, Bill Esmeyer, Clyntnn Esmeyer, Daulton Esmeyer, Scott Felkins, Donald Flatt, Dustin Fletcher, Taylor Foster, James Foxworth, Chisom Frazier, Chris Fremen, Jeffery Fry, Travis Fry, Eric Giddings, Nick Gillespie, Cody Gilmore, Wesley Goff, Charles Golden, Kayle Greiman, Stephen Groden, Josh Gruenwald, Kevin Guess, Justin Haddock, Tim Halowell, Dewayne Harp, Etta Harsen, David Heffernan, Jarred Henderson, Danny Hite, Lorenzer Holmes, Keith Horn, Jacob Inbody, Danny Kaiser, Chad Karn, Kevin Keck, Kyle Keith, Robert Kerr, Robert Kevin Kerr, Michael Krebs, Timothy Kuehnert, Christopher Kuykendall, Mark Laskey, Phillip Lee, Jeffrey Leon, Wesley Lightle, Jeffrey Long, Clayton Marrs, Joseph Marshall, Chase Martin, Keith Martin, Michael McClendon, Gregory McCourt, Glenn McCoy, Jacob McDaniel, Robert McKnight, Logan Mccormick, Greg Meadows, Russell Wayne Slater, Jason Scott Smart, Herschel Benee Smith, Jacky Wayne Smith, Randall Wayne Spyres, Richard Dale Stammer, Zack Jeremiah Stamper, Jon A Steiner, James Patrick Steward, Matt Todd Stewart, John Robert Stika, Vincent Ray Stoops, James Dean Sumner, Bobby Don Sumpter, Nickolas B Swainston, Scott Allan Tarwater, Johnny Ray Tate, Richard Lee Tattershall, Allen Russell Taylor, Joshua Calvin Teague, Blake Lane Teel, Benjamin Nicholas Thulin, Jon D Trumbly, Sean D Vanwagner, James Dewayne Warner, David Wayne Weaver, Yahola Bruner Webb, Jacob Regg Wenaas, Justin David White, Howard Christian Whitehill, Christopher Lowry Whittington, Kendall Jean Williams, Lane Allen Williams, Richard Allen Williams, Dustin David Wolfe, Zachary Glen Wood, Colby James Wright, Jackie Dean Wright, Delano Yarbrough, Steven Wayne Abernathy, Dana Miller, Ronnie Miller, Abraham Montes, Derick Moore, Nathan Morrison, Jonathan Morton, Hayden Moseby, Sean Moser, Kelly Mull, Rodney Mullinax, Galen Murphy, Mickey Nichol, Burl Nicholson, Stephen Pitts, Brandon Potter, Caleb Reed, Michael Regenhard, Samuel Remmert, Rasheem Revels, Samuel Richards, Makayla Ring, Jared Roach, Brett Roberts, Ryan Roberts, Timothy Robinson, Mike Rusher, Camilo Sanchez, Gerald Scott, Robert Scott, Adrienne Seibel, Matthew Shannon, Matt Shearer, Joseph Shepard, Joseph Sherrell, Logan Shultz, Cash Sivadon, John Skidgel, Coleman Parsons, Richard Peaster II, Matthew Penderson, Daniel Phelps, Ashton Phillips, Jeremy Phillips, Dylan Lee Broadland, Ryan Wayne Acree, Brett Tyler Allen, Steven Eugene Daniels, Eric Michael DeLay, Butch Joseph Dellis, Robert Bryan Ellis, II, Aubrey Carl Emerson, Justin Lee Flake, Troy D Franklin, Sr, Kenneth LaRon Gunn, Timothy Allen Higeons, Mark Carson Hodges, Turner Evan Hodges, Korey Thomas Kaiser, Trevor Lee Kennedy, Jason Bert Large, Bradley James King, Simon Adam Lopez and John Leonard Ober
Defendant: City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, George Theron Bynum and Jack Blair
Case Number: 4:2022cv00055
Filed: January 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
2 Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Terence Kern , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 10/4/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2023, Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Terence Kern, Jury Trial set for 3/20/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Terence Kern) (clb, Dpty Clk)
April 4, 2022 Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Joshua D Lamb (Faulman, Sara)
April 1, 2022 Filing 26 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #25 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) by City of Tulsa, Oklahoma, Jack Blair, George Theron Bynum (Vaughn, R)
March 23, 2022 Filing 25 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Andrew Boyd, Nolan Boyd, Trent Brennen, Norita M Bridges, Stacey Briggs, Jayme Brooks, Kyle Brooks, Redell Brown, David Brown, Jr., Stephen Bryan, Brandon Potter, Brien Pritchard, Kody Rackers, Brandon Record, Robert Redricks, Caleb Reed, Jon Reeves, Michael Regenhard, Samuel Remmert, William Remmert, Brian Fields, Donald Flatt, Dustin Fletcher, Chad Foster, Taylor Foster, James Foxworth, Erick Franzen, Chisom Frazier, Matthew Frederickson, Curtis Freeman, Chad Karn, Kevin Keck, Kyle Keith, Stephen Kendrick, Robert Kerr, Robert Kevin Kerr, James Knight, Michael Krebs, James Kremers, Timothy Kuehnert, Chad Savill, Johnnie Sawyer Jr., Roger Schafer, Gerald Scott, Robert Scott, Adrienne Seibel, Micah Seibel, Matthew Shannon, Stephen Shaw, Matt Shearer, Chris Fremen, Jeffery Fry, Travis Fry, James Fuller, Lyle Fulton, Douglas Funston, Dylan Garcia, Ryan Garrett, Joshua Gibson, Eric Giddings, Christopher Kuykendall, Jay LaValley, Jacob Lamb, Joshua D Lamb, Nicholas Lancaster, Jeremy Land, Nolan Lane, Mark Laskey, Matthew C Lay, Phillip Lee, Christopher Weisberg, Jacob Regg Wenaas, Justin Whinery, Justin David White, Howard Christian Whitehill, Christopher Lowry Whittington, Kendall Jean Williams, Lane Allen Williams, Richard Allen Williams, Jacob Wilson, Dan Newbury, Mickey Nichol, Burl Nicholson, Jim Nimmo, Houston Nole, Jimmy Ober, Robert Page II, Coleman Parsons, Roy Parsons, Lyle Payne, Daniel Best, Gary Billups, Trey Blankenship, Jordan Blount, Bryan Bohbrink, Alexa Booth, Anthonie Bounds, Barret Bowman, Brody Bowman, David Merrill, Jacob Meyer, Dana Miller, Ronnie Miller, Blake Mitchell, Abraham Montes, Justin Montgomery, Derick Moore, Danie Morgan, John Morgan, Derek Dixon, Jason Dobson, Tim B Downie, Marty Dukes, Michael Dumond, Annalee Dunaway, Dallas Duncan, Katrina Duncan, Raymond Duran, Travis Eason, Dustin Bartling, Bryan Beall, David Beals, Raymond Lee Beard, Keith Beck, Ryan Beeler, Jared Belk, Matthew Bell, Chad Bentley, Dicus Benton, Gregory McCourt, Glenn McCoy, Richard McCreary, Jacob McDaniel, Robert McKnight, Xavier McNac, Devin McNown, Nicholas McQuay, Logan Mccormick, Greg Meadows, James Connors, Justin Cook, Ryan Creek, Jared Crowder, Jeremiah Daniels, Kellen Davis, Craig C Deerinwater, Tanner DiMarco, Kevin Dickerson, Matthew Dickerson, James Wilson, Nicholas L Wilson, Dustin David Wolfe, Zachary Glen Wood, Colby James Wright, Jackie Dean Wright, Mark Wright, Delano Yarbrough, James Yoder, Dillon Youngblood, Jared Roach, Brett Roberts, Ryan Roberts, Courtney Robinson, Timothy Robinson, David Rollandini, Joshua Rollins, Mike Rudick, Mike Rusher, Camilo Sanchez, Jarred Henderson, Angel Hernandez, Colt Herren, Bennie Herring, Darren Hickson, Danny Hite, Shawn Holland, Blake Hollingsworth, Lorenzer Holmes, Keith Horn, Jason Scott Smart, Andrew Smith, Bradley Smith, Brandon Smith, Herschel Benee Smith, Jacky Wayne Smith, Randall Wayne Spyres, Ryan Spyres, Travis Stallings, Richard Dale Stammer, Jayme Buck, John Buck, Gary Bullock, Tiji Burch, Blake Burd, Garnett Burkhalter III, Traer Burnett, Justin Buthod, Justin Caldwell, Jeffrey Leon, Ty Lewis, Wesley Lightle, Joe Littlefield, James Long, Jeffrey Long, Julie Lynn, Charles Mangold, Kevin Mann, Clayton Marrs, Jerry Camp, Paul Campanell, Todd Canady, Arthur Candler, Joseph Carollo, Aaron Cash, Stephen Cassity, Anthony Castorena, Nicholas Cates, Elvert Celestine, John Robert Stika, Scotty Stokes, Vincent Ray Stoops, Michael Stout, James Dean Sumner, Bobby Don Sumpter, Thomas Sunny, Nickolas B Swainston, Gerry Tarver, Gerry De'Juan Tarver, Joseph Marshall, Chad Martin, Chase Martin, Darrell Martin, James Martin, Keith Martin, Tyler Martin, Vance Massey, Jr, Tracy McAlister, Michael McClendon, Joshua Zweifel, Kevin Horner, Travis Howard, Thomas Hufford, Michael Hughes, Jacob Inbody, Timothy Ingram, Steven Isaacs, Adam Joseph, Jeremy Jurena, Danny Kaiser, Kyle Eller, Grant Ellingson, Justin Ellington, Justin Embrey, Bill Esmeyer, Clyntnn Esmeyer, Daulton Esmeyer, Joshua Evans, Scott Felkins, Christopher Field, Leland Gray, Stephen Green, Tanner Gregory, Kayle Greiman, John Griffin, Victor Grimes, Stephen Groden, Josh Gruenwald, Kevin Guess, Justin Haddock, Mark Avila, Donnie Back, Drew Bailey, Evan Baker, Trent Baker, Christopher Alan Baldwin, Istvan Balogh, James Barnes, Travis Barnes, Jordan Barnett, Michael Chandler, Robert Chorette, Nathan Christie, Shawn Clark, Walter Clark IV, Dalton Clifton, Craig Coats, Brett Cockrum, Conrad Collison, Nick Gillespie, Thomas Gillespie, Tony Gillespie, Cody Gilmore, Wesley Goff, Aaron Goins, Bryan Goins, Charles Golden, Kent Gooch Jr., Angelisa Goodrich, Rasheem Revels, Cade Reyerson, David Rice, Samuel Richards, Jake Richison, Alec Ridener, Nicholas Ridener, Ryan Rider, Makayla Ring, James Roach, Richard Peaster II, Matthew Penderson, Heather D Perkey, Daniel Phelps, Ashton Phillips, Jeremy Phillips, Jonathan Pierce, Danny Pitts, Michael Pitts, Stephen Pitts, Scott Allan Tarwater, Johnny Ray Tate, Richard Lee Tattershall, Matthew Tavaglione, Allen Russell Taylor, Joshua Calvin Teague, Blake Lane Teel, Jenifer Teeter, Darren L Thames, David Thomas, Sean D Vanwagner, Ryan Walker, Kofi Wallace, Colin Ward, Michael D Ward, James Dewayne Warner, David Wayne Weaver, Yahola Bruner Webb, Justin Weber, Matthew Weeks, Shelby Thompson, Timothy Thompson, Ken Thornburg, Benjamin Nicholas Thulin, Jon D Trumbly, Heath Tye, Chase Tyler, Cory Vanarsdel, Colby Vanbuskirk, Colt Vandolah, Steven Wayne Abernathy, Eric D Acosta, Jeremy Agee, Zachary G Allphin, Deon Anderson, Dyce Applegate, Jose Ariza, Jordan Ashlock, Joshua Atterberry, Phillip Austin, Tim Halowell, Zachary Hamby, Lyle Hammock, Dewayne Harp, Jeffrey A Harper, Scott Harper, Etta Harsen, Teddy Harwood, Matthew Heath, David Heffernan, Travis Sheeder, Joseph Shepard, Joseph Sherrell, Logan Shultz, Michael Siler, Brett Sinkbeil, Cash Sivadon, John Skidgel, James Skinner, Russell Wayne Slater, Trenton Morris, Jade Morrison, Nathan Morrison, Jonathan Morton, Hayden Moseby, Jim Moseby, Sean Moser, Kelly Mull, Rodney Mullinax, Galen Murphy, Zack Jeremiah Stamper, James Stanfield, Jon A Steiner, Austin Stevens, James Patrick Steward, Jacob Stewart, Matt Todd Stewart, Robert Stewart, Ronald Stewart, Gary Stika [Note: Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Andrew Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Andrew Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Nolan Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Nolan Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Trent Brennen(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Trent Brennen(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Stacey Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Stacey Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Jayme Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Jayme Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Kyle Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Kyle Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Redell Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Redell Brown(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party David Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party David Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Stephen Bryan(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Stephen Bryan(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brandon Potter(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brandon Potter(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brien Pritchard(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brien Pritchard(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Kody Rackers(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Kody Rackers(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brandon Record(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brandon Record(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Robert Redricks(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Robert Redricks(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Caleb Reed(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Caleb Reed(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Jon Reeves(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Jon Reeves(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Michael Regenhard(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Michael Regenhard(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Samuel Remmert(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Samuel Remmert(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party William Remmert(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party William Remmert(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brian Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Brian Fields(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Donald Flatt(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Donald Flatt(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Dustin Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Dustin Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Chad Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Chad Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Taylor Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Taylor Foster(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party James Foxworth(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party James Foxworth(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Erick Franzen(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Erick Franzen(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Chisom Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Chisom Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Matthew Frederickson(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Matthew Frederickson(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Curtis Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to party Curtis Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney Sara Lynn Faulman added to p
March 14, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Coleman Parsons, Richard Peaster II, Matthew Penderson, Daniel Phelps, Ashton Phillips, Jeremy Phillips [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Coleman Parsons(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Coleman Parsons(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Peaster II(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Peaster II(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Penderson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Penderson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Daniel Phelps(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Daniel Phelps(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ashton Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ashton Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremy Phillips(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremy Phillips(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John)
March 14, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Mike Rusher, Camilo Sanchez, Gerald Scott, Robert Scott, Adrienne Seibel, Matthew Shannon, Matt Shearer, Joseph Shepard, Joseph Sherrell, Logan Shultz, Cash Sivadon, John Skidgel [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mike Rusher(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mike Rusher(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Camilo Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Camilo Sanchez(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gerald Scott(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gerald Scott(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Scott(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Scott(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Adrienne Seibel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Adrienne Seibel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Shannon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Shannon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matt Shearer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matt Shearer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Shepard(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Shepard(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Sherrell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Sherrell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Logan Shultz(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Logan Shultz(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Cash Sivadon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Cash Sivadon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party John Skidgel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party John Skidgel(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John)
March 14, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Stephen Pitts, Brandon Potter, Caleb Reed, Michael Regenhard, Samuel Remmert, Rasheem Revels, Samuel Richards, Makayla Ring, Jared Roach, Brett Roberts, Ryan Roberts, Timothy Robinson [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Pitts(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Pitts(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brandon Potter(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brandon Potter(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Caleb Reed(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Caleb Reed(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Regenhard(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Regenhard(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Samuel Remmert(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Samuel Remmert(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Rasheem Revels(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Rasheem Revels(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Samuel Richards(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Samuel Richards(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Makayla Ring(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Makayla Ring(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jared Roach(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jared Roach(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brett Roberts(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brett Roberts(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ryan Roberts(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ryan Roberts(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Timothy Robinson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Timothy Robinson(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/4/2022) (lmc, Chambers)
March 7, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Dana Miller, Ronnie Miller, Abraham Montes, Derick Moore, Nathan Morrison, Jonathan Morton, Hayden Moseby, Sean Moser, Kelly Mull, Rodney Mullinax, Galen Murphy, Mickey Nichol, Burl Nicholson [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dana Miller(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dana Miller(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ronnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ronnie Miller(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Abraham Montes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Abraham Montes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Derick Moore(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Derick Moore(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nathan Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nathan Morrison(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jonathan Morton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jonathan Morton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Hayden Moseby(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Hayden Moseby(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Sean Moser(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Sean Moser(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kelly Mull(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kelly Mull(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Rodney Mullinax(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Rodney Mullinax(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Galen Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Galen Murphy(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mickey Nichol(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mickey Nichol(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Burl Nicholson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Burl Nicholson(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John)
March 2, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Russell Wayne Slater, Jason Scott Smart, Herschel Benee Smith, Jacky Wayne Smith, Randall Wayne Spyres, Richard Dale Stammer, Zack Jeremiah Stamper, Jon A Steiner, James Patrick Steward, Matt Todd Stewart, John Robert Stika, Vincent Ray Stoops, James Dean Sumner, Bobby Don Sumpter, Nickolas B Swainston, Scott Allan Tarwater, Johnny Ray Tate, Richard Lee Tattershall, Allen Russell Taylor, Joshua Calvin Teague, Blake Lane Teel, Benjamin Nicholas Thulin, Jon D Trumbly, Sean D Vanwagner, James Dewayne Warner, David Wayne Weaver, Yahola Bruner Webb, Jacob Regg Wenaas, Justin David White, Howard Christian Whitehill, Christopher Lowry Whittington, Kendall Jean Williams, Lane Allen Williams, Richard Allen Williams, Dustin David Wolfe, Zachary Glen Wood, Colby James Wright, Jackie Dean Wright, Delano Yarbrough [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Russell Wayne Slater(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Russell Wayne Slater(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jason Scott Smart(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jason Scott Smart(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Herschel Benee Smith(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Herschel Benee Smith(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacky Wayne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacky Wayne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Randall Wayne Spyres(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Randall Wayne Spyres(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Dale Stammer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Dale Stammer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Zack Jeremiah Stamper(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Zack Jeremiah Stamper(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jon A Steiner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jon A Steiner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Patrick Steward(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Patrick Steward(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matt Todd Stewart(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matt Todd Stewart(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party John Robert Stika(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party John Robert Stika(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Vincent Ray Stoops(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Vincent Ray Stoops(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Dean Sumner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Dean Sumner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bobby Don Sumpter(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bobby Don Sumpter(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nickolas B Swainston(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nickolas B Swainston(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Scott Allan Tarwater(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Scott Allan Tarwater(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Johnny Ray Tate(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Johnny Ray Tate(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Lee Tattershall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Lee Tattershall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Allen Russell Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Allen Russell Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joshua Calvin Teague(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joshua Calvin Teague(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Blake Lane Teel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Blake Lane Teel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Benjamin Nicholas Thulin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Benjamin Nicholas Thulin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jon D Trumbly(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jon D Trumbly(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Sean D Vanwagner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Sean D Vanwagner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Dewayne Warner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Dewayne Warner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Wayne Weaver(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Wayne Weaver(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Yahola Bruner Webb(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Yahola Bruner Webb(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob Regg Wenaas(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob Regg Wenaas(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin David White(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin David White(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Howard Christian Whitehill(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Howard Christian Whitehill(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Christopher Lowry Whittington(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Christopher Lowry Whittington(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kendall Jean Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kendall Jean Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Lane Allen Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Lane Allen Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Allen Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Richard Allen Williams(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dustin David Wolfe(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dustin David Wolfe(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Zachary Glen Wood(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Zachary Glen Wood(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Colby James Wright(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Colby James Wright(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jackie Dean Wright(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jackie Dean Wright(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Delano Yarbrough(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Delano Yarbrough(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John)
March 2, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Jack Blair, George Theron Bynum, City of Tulsa, Oklahoma (Vaughn, R)
March 2, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by R Lawson Vaughn, III on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney R Lawson Vaughn, III added to party Jack Blair(pty:dft), Attorney R Lawson Vaughn, III added to party Jack Blair(pty:dft), Attorney R Lawson Vaughn, III added to party George Theron Bynum(pty:dft), Attorney R Lawson Vaughn, III added to party George Theron Bynum(pty:dft), Attorney R Lawson Vaughn, III added to party City of Tulsa, Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney R Lawson Vaughn, III added to party City of Tulsa, Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Vaughn, R)
March 2, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristina L Gray on behalf of All Defendants [Note: Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party Jack Blair(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party Jack Blair(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party George Theron Bynum(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party George Theron Bynum(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party City of Tulsa, Oklahoma(pty:dft), Attorney Kristina L Gray added to party City of Tulsa, Oklahoma(pty:dft).] (Gray, Kristina)
March 1, 2022 NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: plaintiff not added (Steven Wayne Abernathy); Correction: plaintiff added (Steven Wayne Abernathy) (Re: #14 Notice of Consent(s) to Join,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
March 1, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Taylor Foster, James Foxworth, Chisom Frazier, Chris Fremen, Jeffery Fry, Travis Fry, Eric Giddings, Nick Gillespie, Cody Gilmore, Wesley Goff, Charles Golden, Kayle Greiman, Stephen Groden, Josh Gruenwald, Kevin Guess, Justin Haddock, Tim Halowell, Dewayne Harp, Etta Harsen, David Heffernan, Jarred Henderson, Danny Hite, Lorenzer Holmes, Keith Horn, Jacob Inbody, Danny Kaiser, Chad Karn, Kevin Keck, Kyle Keith, Robert Kerr, Robert Kevin Kerr, Michael Krebs, Timothy Kuehnert, Christopher Kuykendall, Mark Laskey, Phillip Lee, Jeffrey Leon, Wesley Lightle, Jeffrey Long, Clayton Marrs, Joseph Marshall, Chase Martin, Keith Martin, Michael McClendon, Gregory McCourt, Glenn McCoy, Jacob McDaniel, Robert McKnight, Logan Mccormick, Greg Meadows [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Taylor Foster(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Taylor Foster(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Foxworth(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Foxworth(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chisom Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chisom Frazier(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chris Fremen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chris Fremen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffery Fry(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffery Fry(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Travis Fry(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Travis Fry(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Eric Giddings(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Eric Giddings(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nick Gillespie(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nick Gillespie(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Cody Gilmore(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Cody Gilmore(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Wesley Goff(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Wesley Goff(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Charles Golden(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Charles Golden(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kayle Greiman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kayle Greiman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Groden(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Groden(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Josh Gruenwald(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Josh Gruenwald(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Guess(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Guess(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Haddock(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Haddock(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tim Halowell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tim Halowell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dewayne Harp(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dewayne Harp(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Etta Harsen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Etta Harsen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Heffernan(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Heffernan(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jarred Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jarred Henderson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Danny Hite(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Danny Hite(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Lorenzer Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Lorenzer Holmes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Keith Horn(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Keith Horn(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob Inbody(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob Inbody(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Danny Kaiser(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Danny Kaiser(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chad Karn(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chad Karn(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Keck(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Keck(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kyle Keith(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kyle Keith(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Kerr(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Kerr(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Kevin Kerr(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Kevin Kerr(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Krebs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Krebs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Timothy Kuehnert(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Timothy Kuehnert(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Christopher Kuykendall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Christopher Kuykendall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mark Laskey(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mark Laskey(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Phillip Lee(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Phillip Lee(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffrey Leon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffrey Leon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Wesley Lightle(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Wesley Lightle(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffrey Long(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffrey Long(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Clayton Marrs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Clayton Marrs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chase Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chase Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Keith Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Keith Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael McClendon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael McClendon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gregory McCourt(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gregory McCourt(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Glenn McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Glenn McCoy(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob McDaniel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob McDaniel(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert McKnight(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert McKnight(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Logan Mccormick(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Logan Mccormick(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Greg Meadows(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Greg Meadows(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John)
March 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Dyce Applegate, Jose Ariza, Jordan Ashlock, Evan Baker, Dustin Bartling, David Beals, Jared Belk, Matthew Bell, Chad Bentley, Dicus Benton, Daniel Best, Gary Billups, Anthonie Bounds, Barret Bowman, Brody Bowman, Trent Brennen, Stacey Briggs, Jayme Buck, Blake Burd, Garnett Burkhalter III, Traer Burnett, Jerry Camp, Todd Canady, Arthur Candler, Aaron Cash, Anthony Castorena, Nicholas Cates, Elvert Celestine, Shawn Clark, Walter Clark IV, Dalton Clifton, Craig Coats, Conrad Collison, Justin Cook, Ryan Creek, Jared Crowder, Jeremiah Daniels, Tanner DiMarco, Kevin Dickerson, Michael Dumond, Dallas Duncan, Raymond Duran, Grant Ellingson, Bill Esmeyer, Clyntnn Esmeyer, Daulton Esmeyer, Scott Felkins, Donald Flatt, Dustin Fletcher [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dyce Applegate(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dyce Applegate(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jose Ariza(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jose Ariza(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jordan Ashlock(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jordan Ashlock(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Evan Baker(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Evan Baker(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dustin Bartling(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dustin Bartling(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Beals(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Beals(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jared Belk(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jared Belk(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Bell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Bell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chad Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chad Bentley(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dicus Benton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dicus Benton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Daniel Best(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Daniel Best(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gary Billups(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gary Billups(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Anthonie Bounds(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Anthonie Bounds(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Barret Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Barret Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brody Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brody Bowman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Trent Brennen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Trent Brennen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stacey Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stacey Briggs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jayme Buck(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jayme Buck(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Blake Burd(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Blake Burd(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Garnett Burkhalter III(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Garnett Burkhalter III(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Traer Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Traer Burnett(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jerry Camp(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jerry Camp(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Todd Canady(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Todd Canady(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Arthur Candler(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Arthur Candler(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Aaron Cash(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Aaron Cash(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Anthony Castorena(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Anthony Castorena(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nicholas Cates(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nicholas Cates(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Elvert Celestine(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Elvert Celestine(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Shawn Clark(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Shawn Clark(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Walter Clark IV(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Walter Clark IV(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dalton Clifton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dalton Clifton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Craig Coats(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Craig Coats(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Conrad Collison(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Conrad Collison(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Cook(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Cook(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ryan Creek(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ryan Creek(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jared Crowder(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jared Crowder(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremiah Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremiah Daniels(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tanner DiMarco(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tanner DiMarco(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Dumond(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Dumond(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dallas Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dallas Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Raymond Duran(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Raymond Duran(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Grant Ellingson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Grant Ellingson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bill Esmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bill Esmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Clyntnn Esmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Clyntnn Esmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Daulton Esmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Daulton Esmeyer(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Scott Felkins(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Scott Felkins(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Donald Flatt(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Donald Flatt(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dustin Fletcher(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dustin Fletcher(pty:pla).] (With attachments) (Stewart, John) Modified on 3/3/2022 (lmt, Dpty Clk).
February 24, 2022 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Chief Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Terence Kern reassigned to case., changing case number to 22-CV-55-TCK-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk)
February 23, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent(s) to Join by Jeremy Agee, Deon Anderson, Joshua Atterberry, Phillip Austin, Mark Avila, Donnie Back, Drew Bailey, Trent Baker, Christopher Alan Baldwin, Istvan Balogh, James Barnes, Travis Barnes, Jordan Barnett, Bryan Beall, Raymond Lee Beard, Keith Beck, Ryan Beeler, Trey Blankenship, Jordan Blount, Bryan Bohbrink, Alexa Booth, Andrew Boyd, Nolan Boyd, Jayme Brooks, Kyle Brooks, Redell Brown, David Brown, Jr., Stephen Bryan, John Buck, Gary Bullock, Tiji Burch, Justin Buthod, Justin Caldwell, Paul Campanell, Joseph Carollo, Stephen Cassity, Michael Chandler, Robert Chorette, Nathan Christie, Brett Cockrum, James Connors, Kellen Davis, Matthew Dickerson, Derek Dixon, Jason Dobson, Marty Dukes, Annalee Dunaway, Katrina Duncan, Travis Eason, Kyle Eller, Justin Ellington, Justin Embrey, Joshua Evans, Christopher Field, Brian Fields, Chad Foster, Erick Franzen, Matthew Frederickson, Curtis Freeman, James Fuller, Lyle Fulton, Douglas Funston, Dylan Garcia, Ryan Garrett, Joshua Gibson, Thomas Gillespie, Tony Gillespie, Aaron Goins, Bryan Goins, Kent Gooch Jr., Angelisa Goodrich, Leland Gray, Stephen Green, Tanner Gregory, John Griffin, Victor Grimes, Zachary Hamby, Lyle Hammock, Scott Harper, Teddy Harwood, Matthew Heath, Angel Hernandez, Colt Herren, Bennie Herring, Darren Hickson, Shawn Holland, Blake Hollingsworth, Kevin Horner, Travis Howard, Thomas Hufford, Michael Hughes, Timothy Ingram, Steven Isaacs, Adam Joseph, Jeremy Jurena, Stephen Kendrick, James Knight, James Kremers, Jacob Lamb, Nicholas Lancaster, Jeremy Land, Nolan Lane, Jay LaValley, Ty Lewis, Joe Littlefield, James Long, Julie Lynn, Charles Mangold, Kevin Mann, Chad Martin, Darrell Martin, James Martin, Tyler Martin, Vance Massey, Jr, Tracy McAlister, Richard McCreary, Xavier McNac, Devin McNown, Nicholas McQuay, David Merrill, Jacob Meyer, Blake Mitchell, Justin Montgomery, Danie Morgan, John Morgan, Trenton Morris, Jade Morrison, Jim Moseby, Dan Newbury, Jim Nimmo, Houston Nole, Jimmy Ober, Robert Page II, Roy Parsons, Lyle Payne, Jonathan Pierce, Danny Pitts, Michael Pitts, Brien Pritchard, Kody Rackers, Brandon Record, Robert Redricks, Jon Reeves, William Remmert, Cade Reyerson, David Rice, Jake Richison, Alec Ridener, Nicholas Ridener, Ryan Rider, James Roach, Courtney Robinson, David Rollandini, Joshua Rollins, Mike Rudick, Chad Savill, Johnnie Sawyer Jr., Roger Schafer, Micah Seibel, Stephen Shaw, Travis Sheeder, Michael Siler, Brett Sinkbeil, James Skinner, Andrew Smith, Bradley Smith, Brandon Smith, Ryan Spyres, Travis Stallings, James Stanfield, Austin Stevens, Jacob Stewart, Robert Stewart, Gary Stika, Scotty Stokes, Michael Stout, Thomas Sunny, Gerry Tarver, Gerry De'Juan Tarver, Matthew Tavaglione, Jenifer Teeter, David Thomas, Shelby Thompson, Timothy Thompson, Ken Thornburg, Heath Tye, Chase Tyler, Cory Vanarsdel, Colby Vanbuskirk, Colt Vandolah, Ryan Walker, Kofi Wallace, Colin Ward, Justin Weber, Matthew Weeks, Christopher Weisberg, Justin Whinery, Jacob Wilson, James Wilson, Mark Wright, James Yoder, Dillon Youngblood, Joshua Zweifel [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremy Agee(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Deon Anderson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joshua Atterberry(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Phillip Austin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Mark Avila(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Donnie Back(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Drew Bailey(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Trent Baker(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Christopher Alan Baldwin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Istvan Balogh(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Travis Barnes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jordan Barnett(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bryan Beall(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Raymond Lee Beard(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Keith Beck(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ryan Beeler(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Trey Blankenship(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jordan Blount(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bryan Bohbrink(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Alexa Booth(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Andrew Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nolan Boyd(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jayme Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kyle Brooks(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Redell Brown(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party David Brown, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Bryan(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party John Buck(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Gary Bullock(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tiji Burch(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Buthod(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Caldwell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Paul Campanell(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joseph Carollo(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Cassity(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Chandler(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Robert Chorette(pty:pet), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nathan Christie(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brett Cockrum(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Connors(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kellen Davis(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Dickerson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Derek Dixon(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jason Dobson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Marty Dukes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Annalee Dunaway(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Katrina Duncan(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Travis Eason(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kyle Eller(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Ellington(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Justin Embrey(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joshua Evans(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Christopher Field(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Brian Fields(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chad Foster(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Erick Franzen(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Frederickson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Curtis Freeman(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Fuller(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Lyle Fulton(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Douglas Funston(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Dylan Garcia(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ryan Garrett(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joshua Gibson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Thomas Gillespie(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tony Gillespie(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Aaron Goins(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bryan Goins(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kent Gooch Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Angelisa Goodrich(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Leland Gray(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Green(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tanner Gregory(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party John Griffin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Victor Grimes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Zachary Hamby(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Lyle Hammock(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Scott Harper(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Teddy Harwood(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew Heath(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Angel Hernandez(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Colt Herren(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Bennie Herring(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Darren Hickson(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Shawn Holland(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Blake Hollingsworth(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Horner(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Travis Howard(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Thomas Hufford(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael Hughes(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Timothy Ingram(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Steven Isaacs(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Adam Joseph(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremy Jurena(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Stephen Kendrick(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Knight(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Kremers(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jacob Lamb(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nicholas Lancaster(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeremy Land(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nolan Lane(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jay LaValley(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ty Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joe Littlefield(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Long(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Julie Lynn(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Charles Mangold(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Kevin Mann(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Chad Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Darrell Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party James Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tyler Martin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewar
February 23, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John W Stewart on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney John W Stewart added to party Eric D Acosta(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Zachary G Allphin(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Norita M Bridges(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Craig C Deerinwater(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Tim B Downie(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Jeffrey A Harper(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Joshua D Lamb(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Matthew C Lay(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Heather D Perkey(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Ronald Stewart(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Darren L Thames(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Michael D Ward(pty:pla), Attorney John W Stewart added to party Nicholas L Wilson(pty:pla).] (Stewart, John)
February 18, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James Patrick Hunt on behalf of Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson (Hunt, James)
February 18, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sara Lynn Faulman on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Faulman, Sara)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III granting Plaintiffs' Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to John Stewart and Sara Lyn Faulman. Local counsel is directed to advise Mr. Stewart and Ms. Faulman of the requirements of Local General Rule 4-4(a) and the need to register as a CM/ECF user in this Court ; granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #5 First MOTION for Attorney(s) Sara Lyn Faulman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2561787) ) by Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson (With attachments) (Hunt, James)
February 16, 2022 Filing 6 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #4 First MOTION for Attorney(s) John Stewart to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2561684) ) by Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson (With attachments) (Hunt, James)
February 15, 2022 Filing 5 First MOTION for Attorney(s) Sara Lyn Faulman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2561787) by Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson (With attachments) (Hunt, James)
February 15, 2022 Filing 4 First MOTION for Attorney(s) John Stewart to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2561684) by Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson (With attachments) (Hunt, James)
February 1, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Jack Blair, George Theron Bynum, City of Tulsa, Oklahoma (sc, Dpty Clk)
February 1, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2553556) by Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Eric D Acosta, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Darren L Thames (With attachments) (Hunt, James) Modified on 2/2/2022 to edit text to reflect correct "against" party (sc, Dpty Clk).
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Eric D Acosta, Zachary G Allphin, Norita M Bridges, Craig C Deerinwater, Tim B Downie, Jeffrey A Harper, Joshua D Lamb, Matthew C Lay, Heather D Perkey, Ronald Stewart, Darren L Thames, Michael D Ward, Nicholas L Wilson (Hunt, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamb et al v. City of Tulsa, Oklahoma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua D Lamb
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew C Lay
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric D Acosta
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary G Allphin
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norita M Bridges
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig C Deerinwater
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim B Downie
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A Harper
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather D Perkey
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Stewart
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren L Thames
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Ward
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas L Wilson
Represented By: James Patrick Hunt
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Agee
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deon Anderson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Atterberry
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Austin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Avila
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnie Back
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Bailey
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Baker
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Alan Baldwin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Istvan Balogh
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Barnes
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Barnes
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Barnett
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Beall
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lee Beard
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Beck
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Beeler
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trey Blankenship
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Blount
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Bohbrink
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Booth
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Boyd
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Boyd
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Brooks
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Brooks
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Redell Brown
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Bryan
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Buck
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Bullock
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiji Burch
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Buthod
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Caldwell
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Campanell
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Carollo
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Cassity
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Chandler
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chorette
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Christie
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Cockrum
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Connors
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellen Davis
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Dickerson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Dixon
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Dobson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marty Dukes
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annalee Dunaway
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Duncan
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Eason
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Eller
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Ellington
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Embrey
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Evans
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Field
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Fields
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Foster
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Franzen
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Frederickson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Freeman
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Fuller
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Fulton
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Funston
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Garcia
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Garrett
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gibson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gillespie
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Gillespie
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Goins
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Goins
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Gooch Jr.
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelisa Goodrich
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leland Gray
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Green
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanner Gregory
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Griffin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Grimes
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Hamby
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Hammock
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Harper
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teddy Harwood
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Heath
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Hernandez
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colt Herren
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Herring
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Hickson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Holland
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Hollingsworth
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Horner
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Howard
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Hufford
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hughes
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ingram
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Isaacs
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Joseph
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Jurena
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kendrick
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Knight
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Kremers
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Lamb
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Lancaster
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Land
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Lane
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay LaValley
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ty Lewis
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Littlefield
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Long
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Lynn
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Mangold
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Mann
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Martin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell Martin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Martin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Martin
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vance Massey, Jr
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McAlister
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard McCreary
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier McNac
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin McNown
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas McQuay
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Merrill
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Meyer
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Montgomery
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danie Morgan
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Morgan
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trenton Morris
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Morrison
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Moseby
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Newbury
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Nimmo
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston Nole
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Ober
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Page II
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Parsons
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Payne
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Pierce
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Pitts
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pitts
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brien Pritchard
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kody Rackers
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Record
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Redricks
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Reeves
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Remmert
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cade Reyerson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rice
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Richison
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alec Ridener
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Ridener
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Rider
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Roach
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Robinson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rollandini
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Rollins
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Rudick
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Savill
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnnie Sawyer Jr.
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Schafer
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micah Seibel
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Shaw
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Sheeder
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Siler
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Sinkbeil
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Skinner
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Smith
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Smith
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Smith
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Spyres
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Stallings
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stanfield
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Stevens
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stika
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Stokes
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stout
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Sunny
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry Tarver
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerry De'Juan Tarver
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Tavaglione
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenifer Teeter
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Thomas
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Thompson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Thompson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Thornburg
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heath Tye
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chase Tyler
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Vanarsdel
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colby Vanbuskirk
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colt Vandolah
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Walker
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kofi Wallace
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Ward
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Weber
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Weeks
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Weisberg
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Whinery
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Wilson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Wright
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Yoder
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Youngblood
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Zweifel
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dyce Applegate
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ariza
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Ashlock
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evan Baker
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Bartling
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Beals
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Belk
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Bell
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Bentley
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dicus Benton
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Best
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Billups
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthonie Bounds
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barret Bowman
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brody Bowman
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trent Brennen
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Briggs
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayme Buck
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Burd
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garnett Burkhalter III
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traer Burnett
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Camp
Represented By: John W Stewart
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Canady
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Candler
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Cash
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Castorena
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Cates
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvert Celestine
Represented By: Sara Lynn Faulman
Represented By: John W Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal |