Quezada v. Roden et al
Plaintiff: Angelica Quezada
Defendant: Clinton Scott Walton, Ronnie Roden, Scott Walton and Kyle Baker
Case Number: 4:2022cv00092
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Terence Kern
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Clinton Scott Walton (Boone, Baylor)
April 11, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Ronnie Roden (Boone, Baylor)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - In light of filing of the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. 11] the Motions to Dismiss (Dkts. 7,8) are moot. ; finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Re: #11 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
March 28, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Dana Grey Jim on behalf of Angelica Quezada [Note: Attorney Dana Grey Jim added to party Angelica Quezada(pty:pla).] (Jim, Dana)
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Angelica Quezada (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Angelica Quezada (McHugh, Brendan)
March 21, 2022 Filing 10 JURY DEMAND by Angelica Quezada (McHugh, Brendan)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brendan Michael McHugh on behalf of Angelica Quezada (McHugh, Brendan)
March 8, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Clinton Scott Walton (Boone, Baylor)
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Ronnie Roden (Boone, Baylor)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Baylor C. Boone on behalf of All Defendants (Boone, Baylor)
March 8, 2022 Filing 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Adrian LeBlanc on behalf of Ronnie Roden, Clinton Scott Walton [Note: Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Ronnie Roden(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Adrian LeBlanc added to party Clinton Scott Walton(pty:dft).] (LeBlanc, Thomas)
March 4, 2022 Filing 4 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Ronnie Roden, Clinton Scott Walton (Boone, Baylor)
March 4, 2022 Filing 3 ERRATA/CORRECTION (Re: #2 Notice of Removal, ) by Ronnie Roden, Clinton Scott Walton (Boone, Baylor)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Rogers, case number CJ-2021-295 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2568887) by Ronnie Roden, Clinton Scott Walton (With attachments) (Boone, Baylor) Modified on 3/4/2022 to seal Exhibit as it was filed unredacted; counsel will file the redacted version (sc, Dpty Clk).
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ronnie Roden, Clinton Scott Walton (Boone, Baylor)
October 15, 2021 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Angelica Quezada (lmt, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quezada v. Roden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton Scott Walton
Represented By: Baylor C. Boone
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Roden
Represented By: Baylor C. Boone
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Walton
Represented By: Baylor C. Boone
Represented By: Thomas Adrian LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelica Quezada
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?