Whitman v. DCP Midstream, LLC
Plaintiff: Joel Whitman
Defendant: DCP Midstream, LLC
Intervenor Defendant: Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC
Case Number: 4:2022cv00106
Filed: March 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: John F Heil
Referring Judge: Christine D Little
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III regarding delay of Scheduling Order. (Re: #28 , #21 ) (JFH1, Chambers)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Joint STATUS REPORT by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC (Bollman, John)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/27/2022) (JFH1, Chambers)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald L. Samuels on behalf of DCP Midstream, LLC (Samuels, Donald)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Joel Whitman [Note: Attorney Michael Burrage added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla).] (Burrage, Michael)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Beth Cowen on behalf of Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC [Note: Attorney Rachel Beth Cowen added to party Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC(pty:intvd).] (Cowen, Rachel)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cypress Energy Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Energy Holdings II, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Energy GP Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Environmental Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Environmental Partners, G.P., LLC for Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC) by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC (DeMuro, Paul)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Plaintiff is directed to comply with Local General Rule 4-3(a) regarding the responsibilities of non-resident counsel, or to show cause why he has not, no later than April 8, 2022. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Granting Defendant's motion as to Donald L. Samuels. Local counsel is directed to advise him of the requirements of Local General Rule 4-4(a) and the need to register as a CM/ECF user in this Court ; granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald L. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2585368) by DCP Midstream, LLC (With attachments) (Tucker, John)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DCP Midstream, LLC (Tucker, John)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by John H Tucker on behalf of DCP Midstream, LLC [Note: Attorney John H Tucker added to party DCP Midstream, LLC(pty:dft).] (Tucker, John)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Denelda Richardson on behalf of DCP Midstream, LLC [Note: Attorney Denelda Richardson added to party DCP Midstream, LLC(pty:dft).] (Richardson, Denelda)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Granting Defendants motion as to Rachel Cowen. Local counsel is directed to advise her of the requirements of Local General Rule 4-4(a) and the need to register as a CM/ECF user in this Court ; granting #64 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Granting Defendants motion as to John Barrick Bollman. Local counsel is directed to advise him of the requirements of Local General Rule 4-4(a) and the need to register as a CM/ECF user in this Court ; granting #63 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION for Attorney(s) Rachel Cowen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2577760) by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney(s) John Barrick Bollman to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2577757) by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC (With attachments) (DeMuro, Paul)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paul DeMuro on behalf of Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC [Note: Attorney Paul DeMuro added to party Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC(pty:intvd).] (DeMuro, Paul)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , changing case number to 22-cv-00106-JFH-CDL (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to John Barrick Bollman (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Matthew E. Kapsak and Donald L. Samuels (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Jason N.W. Plowman (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 LETTER re: Local Counsel Requirement sent to Andrew Wells Dunlap, William R. Liles and Michael Andrew Josephson (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing DCP Midstream, LLC and Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Colorado 20-cv-03352-RBJ Modified on 3/8/2022 to correct file date (ll, Dpty Clk).
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/7/2022, re #50 DCP's and Cypress's joint motion to transfer the case to the United States District Courtfor the Northern District of Oklahoma is GRANTED. The Clerk will take the appropriate steps to implement the transfer. (sphil, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 REPLY to Response to #50 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Intervenor Defendant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Bollman, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 RESPONSE to #50 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Transfer Case by Intervenor Defendant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bollman, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER re: 37 Order to Show Cause, #46 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by DCP Midstream, LLC, #47 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC, and #48 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Joel Whitman. The Court has reviewed defendant's, intervenor defendant's, and plaintiff's responses to the Court's order to show cause, ECF No. 37. The order was framed, incorrectly, in terms of 28 U.S.C. section 1406. The parties have shown, and the Court agrees, that venue cannot be transferred pursuant to that section because venue in this district is neither wrong nor improper. The issue, correctly stated, is whether venue may and should be transferred pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1404. There is no pending motion to transfer venue under that section, but the Court would, of course, address such a motion if it were filed. The order to show cause is discharged. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/11/2022. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 37 by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 37 by Intervenor Defendant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Bollman, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 37 by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Samuels, Donald) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Order to Show Cause. Response is due 1/5/2022. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/30/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Proposed Order to #43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Order to Show Cause by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Kapsak, Matthew) Modified on 12/29/2021 to edit document title. (sphil, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Order to Show Cause by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Kapsak, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Matthew E. Kapsak (Kapsak, Matthew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order To Show Cause. Response due 1/5/2022. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/23/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Order To Show Cause by Intervenor Defendant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Bollman, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to File re #38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause Show Cause Response due by 1/5/2022. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/23/21. Text Only Entry(jdyne, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Paragraph four of the Employment Agreement (ECF 28-2) reads: "any judicial action... arising out of Employee's employment... or this Employment Agreement will be brought and maintained exclusively in federal or state court in Tulsa, Oklahoma." The Court now orders the parties to show cause within 14 days why the case should not be either dismissed without prejudice or transferred to the relevant federal district under 28 U.S.C. 1406. Show Cause response due by 12/29/2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 12/15/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Surreply and Memoranda Opposing 28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/21/2021. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to file Surreply and Memoranda Opposing #28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPLY to Response to #28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Intervenor Defendant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Bollman, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Barrick Bollman on behalf of Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLCAttorney John Barrick Bollman added to party Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC(pty:intvd) (Bollman, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION REGARDING ARBITRATION AGREEMENT by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Samuels, Donald) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Kapsak on behalf of DCP Midstream, LLC (Kapsak, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Mary Elizabeth Kapsak was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Counsel, however, need not pay any delinquent biennial fees. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (tnguy) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE to #28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Intervenor Defendant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sharon Moyer, #2 Exhibit A1 to Moyer Declaration - Employment Agreement, #3 Exhibit A2 to Moyer Declaration - Acknowledgment of Employee Handbook, #4 Exhibit A3 to Moyer Declaration - Consent to Electronic Distribution of Employee Benefits Information, #5 Exhibit A4 to Moyer Declaration - Consent to Procurement of Motor Vehicle Reports, #6 Exhibit A5 to Moyer Declaration - Payroll Deduction Authorization, #7 Exhibit A6 to Moyer Declaration - Acknowledgement of Drug and Alcohol Misuse Prevention Plan, #8 Exhibit A7 to Moyer Declaration - Acknowledgement of Safety Training, #9 Exhibit A8 to Moyer Declaration - Inspector Pay Offers, #10 Exhibit A9 to Moyer Declaration - Paystubs, #11 Exhibit A10 to Moyer Declaration - IRS W-2 Tax Forms)(Gokenbach, Jennifer) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach on behalf of Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLCAttorney Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach added to party Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC(pty:intvd) (Gokenbach, Jennifer) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Stay by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/1/21.(jdyne, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER re: #23 STIPULATION re #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action. CEM is granted leave to intervene. CEM's motion to compel arbitration is due April 8, 2021. Plaintiff's response to the motions to compel arbitration is due April 30, 2021. One combined response, not to exceed 15 pages. Please note, the pending motion to compel arbitration (motion and brief combined) exceeds the Court's page limits. However, because the last two pages are a signature page and a certificate of service, the Court will not strike the motion this time. Motions and briefs should not separate. The Court counts all pages from the top of the caption to the end of the certificate of service. Defendants' combined reply will be due May 14, 2021, in combination may not exceed the Court's page limits for a reply. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/1/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), William R. Liles was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION re #21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER re: #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and for Entry of Protective Order filed by DCP Midstream, LLC. The Court requests that a response be filed no later than March 30, 2021. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/23/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action, #2 Exhibit A Declaration of Sharon Moyer, #3 Exhibit A1 to Moyer Declaration, #4 Exhibit A2 to Moyer Declaration, #5 Exhibit A3 to Moyer Declaration, #6 Exhibit A4 to Moyer Declaration, #7 Exhibit A5 to Moyer Declaration, #8 Exhibit A6 to Moyer Declaration, #9 Exhibit A7 to Moyer Declaration, #10 Exhibit A8 to Moyer Declaration, #11 Exhibit A9 to Moyer Declaration, #12 Exhibit A10 to Moyer Declaration, #13 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Samuels, Donald) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and for Entry of Protective Order by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Stay Proceedings and For Entry of Protective Order, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sharon Moyer, #3 Exhibit A1 to Moyer Declaration, #4 Exhibit A2 to Moyer Declaration, #5 Exhibit A3 to Moyer Declaration, #6 Exhibit A4 to Moyer Declaration, #7 Exhibit A5 to Moyer Declaration, #8 Exhibit A6 to Moyer Declaration, #9 Exhibit A7 to Moyer Declaration, #10 Exhibit A8 to Moyer Declaration, #11 Exhibit A9 to Moyer Declaration, #12 Exhibit A10 to Moyer Declaration, #13 Exhibit B, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit D, #16 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Samuels, Donald) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Original Collective Action Complaint #1 Complaint, by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. (Kapsak, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Original Collective Action Complaint by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Original Collective Action Complaint (Redlined))(Kapsak, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Certify Class and Court Authorized Notice by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL: Five to Seven day Jury Trial set to commence 6/13/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson with a Trial Preparation Conference on 5/20/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/4/21. (jdyne, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/11/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2022. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/26/21. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. The proposed scheduling order should be prepared as described in the local rules. A copy of instructions for the preparation of a scheduling order and a form scheduling order can be downloaded from the Courts website www.cod.uscourts.gov/CourtOperations/RulesProcedures/Forms.aspx. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/26/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corrected ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by DCP Midstream, LLC.(Plowman, Jason) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Kapsak on behalf of DCP Midstream, LLCAttorney Mary Elizabeth Kapsak added to party DCP Midstream, LLC(pty:dft) (Kapsak, Mary) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jason N.W. Plowman added to party DCP Midstream, LLC(pty:dft) by DCP Midstream, LLC.(Plowman, Jason) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. DCP Midstream, LLC answer due 12/28/2020. (Samuels, Donald) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Whitman. DCP Midstream, LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Joel WhitmanAttorney William R. Liles added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla) (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Joel WhitmanAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DCP Midstream, LLC by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DCP Midstream, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7583346)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla), filed by Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitman v. DCP Midstream, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Whitman
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: William Richard Liles
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCP Midstream, LLC
Represented By: Jason N.W. Plowman
Represented By: Matthew E. Kapsak
Represented By: Donald L. Samuels
Represented By: Denelda Richardson
Represented By: John H Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach
Represented By: John Barrick Bollman
Represented By: Paul DeMuro
Represented By: Rachel Beth Cowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?