Fowler et al v. Stitt et al
Plaintiff: Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall, C.R. and CR
Defendant: Kevin Stitt, Keith Reed and Kelly Baker
Case Number: 4:2022cv00115
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Gregory K Frizzell
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell ; granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint, #4 MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously ) (lah, Chambers)
May 4, 2022 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Kelly Baker, Keith Reed, Kevin Stitt (Weaver, Audrey)
May 4, 2022 Filing 18 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Zachary Paul West on behalf of Kelly Baker, Keith Reed, Kevin Stitt [Note: Attorney Zachary Paul West added to party Kelly Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Paul West added to party Keith Reed(pty:dft), Attorney Zachary Paul West added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft).] (West, Zachary)
May 4, 2022 Filing 17 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryan Cleveland on behalf of Kelly Baker, Keith Reed, Kevin Stitt [Note: Attorney Bryan Cleveland added to party Kelly Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Cleveland added to party Keith Reed(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Cleveland added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft).] (Cleveland, Bryan)
May 4, 2022 Filing 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Audrey A Weaver on behalf of Kelly Baker, Keith Reed, Kevin Stitt [Note: Attorney Audrey A Weaver added to party Kelly Baker(pty:dft), Attorney Audrey A Weaver added to party Keith Reed(pty:dft), Attorney Audrey A Weaver added to party Kevin Stitt(pty:dft).] (Weaver, Audrey)
April 22, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kelly Baker (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall, CR (Wilkins, Karen)
April 22, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Keith Reed (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall, CR (Wilkins, Karen)
April 22, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed re: Kevin Stitt (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall, CR (Wilkins, Karen)
March 17, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Nicholas Arthur Guillory on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Guillory, Nicholas)
March 17, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Shelly Lynn Skeen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Skeen, Shelly)
March 17, 2022 Filing 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Peter C Renn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Renn, Peter)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell granting Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice and ; adding attorney Shelly Lynn Skeen,Nicholas Arthur Guillory,Peter C Renn for C.R.,Shelly Lynn Skeen,Nicholas Arthur Guillory,Peter C Renn for Rowan Fowler,Shelly Lynn Skeen,Nicholas Arthur Guillory,Peter C Renn for Allister Hall ; granting #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (kjp, Dpty Clk)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Kelly Baker, Keith Reed, Kevin Stitt (bjb, Dpty Clk)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Peter C. Renn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2576499) by C.R., Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall (With attachments) (Wilkins, Karen)
March 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney(s) Nicholas Guillory to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2576498) by C.R., Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall (With attachments) (Wilkins, Karen)
March 14, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shelly L. Skeen to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2576497) by C.R., Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall (With attachments) (Wilkins, Karen)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Pseudonymously (Re: #2 Complaint ) by C.R. (Wilkins, Karen)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Karen Keith Wilkins on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wilkins, Karen)
March 14, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2576493) by Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall, C.R. (Wilkins, Karen)
March 14, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by C.R., Rowan Fowler, Allister Hall (Wilkins, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler et al v. Stitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rowan Fowler
Represented By: Karen Keith Wilkins
Represented By: Nicholas Arthur Guillory
Represented By: Peter C Renn
Represented By: Shelly Lynn Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allister Hall
Represented By: Karen Keith Wilkins
Represented By: Nicholas Arthur Guillory
Represented By: Peter C Renn
Represented By: Shelly Lynn Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.R.
Represented By: Karen Keith Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CR
Represented By: Karen Keith Wilkins
Represented By: Nicholas Arthur Guillory
Represented By: Peter C Renn
Represented By: Shelly Lynn Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stitt
Represented By: Audrey A Weaver
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Reed
Represented By: Audrey A Weaver
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Baker
Represented By: Audrey A Weaver
Represented By: Bryan Cleveland
Represented By: Zachary Paul West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?