White v. Bowling, et al
Plaintiff: Charla White
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek, Bret Bowling, Turn Key Health Clinics, L.L.C., Cody Smith, Michelle Stovall, Todd Gene Inks, Cynthia Thompson and John Doe
Case Number: 4:2022cv00139
Filed: March 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Claire V Eagan
Referring Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 6/6/2022) (RGG, Chambers)
May 5, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #14 Amended Complaint ) by Todd Gene Inks, Michelle Stovall, Cynthia Thompson (Carr, Michael)
May 5, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: #14 Amended Complaint ) by Bret Bowling (Carr, Michael)
April 22, 2022 Filing 16 SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Turn Key Health Clinics, L.L.C. (sc, Dpty Clk)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to plaintiff's filing of #14 Amended Complaint ; finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss (Re: #14 Amended Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
April 21, 2022 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bret Bowling, Todd Gene Inks, Michelle Stovall, Cynthia Thompson, Turn Key Health Clinics, L.L.C. and DOES #1-5 (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Charla White (Blakemore, Robert)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bryon Davis Helm on behalf of Charla White [Note: Attorney Bryon Davis Helm added to party Charla White(pty:pla).] (Helm, Bryon)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert Murray Blakemore on behalf of Charla White [Note: Attorney Robert Murray Blakemore added to party Charla White(pty:pla).] (Blakemore, Robert)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel E Smolen on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney Daniel E Smolen added to party Charla White(pty:pla).] (Smolen, Daniel)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2), the Court finds good cause for delay in entering the scheduling order. If necessary, a scheduling order will be entered after ruling on the pending motions to dismiss (Dkt. # 7, 9). (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support, #9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Bret Bowling, Todd Gene Inks, Cody Smith, Michelle Stovall, Cynthia Thompson (With attachments) (Carr, Michael)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , : Counsel for Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek is directed to provide, forthwith and in a three-ring binder notebook for use by the Court, a paper copy of the document and/or exhibit(s) as filed at Dkt. #7 . Said paper copy shall be a COMPLETE and EXACT duplicate of the filing AFTER it is filed with the Court, including the case and docket number information at the top of each page. Counsel shall not reorganize the filing or insert other separately docketed items. If a copy of a sealed item is ordered by the Court, then said copy shall be a separate and complete submission. (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek (With attachments) (Carr, Michael)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Upon and since filing of the notice of removal, Parties are to take notice that documents are being filed in this matter which incorrectly cite the case number. The correct case number, 22-CV-0139-CVE-SH, should be noted and corrected on all future pleadings. (Re: #4 Appearance - Attorney, #5 Jury Demand, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Appearance - Attorney ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 JURY DEMAND by Charla White (McHugh, Brendan)
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Brendan Michael McHugh on behalf of Charla White (McHugh, Brendan)
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Lee Carr on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek, Bret Bowling, Todd Gene Inks, Cody Smith, Michelle Stovall, Cynthia Thompson (Carr, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek, Bret Bowling, Todd Gene Inks, Cody Smith, Michelle Stovall, Cynthia Thompson (Carr, Michael)
March 28, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Creek County, case number CV-2022-28 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2585475) by Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek, Bret Bowling, Todd Gene Inks, Cody Smith, Michelle Stovall, Cynthia Thompson (With attachments) (Carr, Michael)
February 7, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Charla White (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Bowling, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charla White
Represented By: Brendan Michael McHugh
Represented By: Dana Grey Jim
Represented By: Bryon Davis Helm
Represented By: Daniel E Smolen
Represented By: Robert Murray Blakemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Creek
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bret Bowling
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Smith
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Stovall
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Gene Inks
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Thompson
Represented By: Michael Lee Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?