Milton v. Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Christine Milton
Defendant: Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The
Case Number: 4:2022cv00146
Filed: March 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Susan E Huntsman
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 25 ANSWER (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (Paruolo, Thomas)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern : Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Related deadlines (Dkt. #23) is GRANTED. The dealine to confer is extended through and including June 7, 2022, and the deadline to submit a Joint Status Report and Initial Disclosures is extended through and including June 21, 2022 ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Status Report due by 6/21/2022); granting #23 Motion to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (clb, Dpty Clk)
April 28, 2022 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Accelerate/Extend/Reset Hearing(s)/Deadline(s) (Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report and Related Deadlines) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (With attachments) (Phaff, Sarah)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition (Dkt. 21) until 5/24/2022 is granted. ; granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
April 22, 2022 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (With attachments) (Phaff, Sarah)
April 12, 2022 Filing 20 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Sarah Phaff on behalf of Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The [Note: Attorney Sarah Phaff added to party Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The(pty:dft).] (Phaff, Sarah)
April 12, 2022 Filing 19 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Darrick McDuffie on behalf of Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The [Note: Attorney Darrick McDuffie added to party Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The(pty:dft).] (McDuffie, Darrick)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 5/9/2022) (lmc, Chambers)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Darrick L. McDuffie is admitted pro hac vice for Defendant. ; granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
April 5, 2022 Filing 16 JURY DEMAND by Christine Milton (Smolen, Donald)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Hunter Keith Bailey on behalf of Christine Milton [Note: Attorney Hunter Keith Bailey added to party Christine Milton(pty:pla).] (Bailey, Hunter)
April 5, 2022 Filing 14 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Laura L Hamilton on behalf of Christine Milton [Note: Attorney Laura L Hamilton added to party Christine Milton(pty:pla).] (Hamilton, Laura)
April 5, 2022 Filing 13 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr on behalf of Christine Milton [Note: Attorney Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr added to party Christine Milton(pty:pla).] (Murphy, Lawrence)
April 5, 2022 Filing 12 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald Eugene Smolen, II on behalf of Christine Milton (Smolen, Donald)
April 5, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Darrick L. McDuffie to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2590005) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (With attachments) (Paruolo, Thomas)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Sarah M. Phaff is admitted pro hac vice for Defendant. ; granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (lmc, Chambers)
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sarah M. Phaff to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2589570) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (With attachments) (Paruolo, Thomas)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER by Judge Terence Kern - Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Petition (Dkt. 7) until April 29, 2022 is granted. ; granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmc, Chambers)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (With attachments) (Paruolo, Thomas)
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 FILING FEES Paid in Full by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (sc, Dpty Clk)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing The Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk)
March 30, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent The Cheesecake Factory Incorporated for Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The) by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (Paruolo, Thomas)
March 30, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Thomas Andrew Paruolo on behalf of Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (Paruolo, Thomas)
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa County District Court, case number CJ-2022-00730 by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (With attachments) (Paruolo, Thomas)
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The (Paruolo, Thomas)
March 10, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The by Christine Milton (ll, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milton v. Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Milton
Represented By: Donald Eugene Smolen, II
Represented By: Laura L Hamilton
Represented By: Lawrence Richard Murphy, Jr
Represented By: Hunter Keith Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheesecake Factory Restaurants, Inc., The
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Paruolo
Represented By: Darrick McDuffie
Represented By: Sarah Phaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?