Hawkins v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Donna Hawkins
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00299
Filed: July 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi F Jayne
Referring Judge: Terence Kern
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER by Judge Terence Kern for Joint Status Report, directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 9/29/2022) (lmc, Chambers)
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ryan James Fulda on behalf of Donna Hawkins (Fulda, Ryan)
July 12, 2022 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk)
July 12, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
July 12, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
July 12, 2022 Filing 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
July 12, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Washington County, case number CJ-2022-117 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2641001) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica)
July 12, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
June 13, 2022 PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Donna Hawkins (lmt, Dpty Clk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hawkins
Represented By: Ryan James Fulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?